EP0393946 - Video control circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.05.1996 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.07.1996 [1996/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THOMSON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS, INC. 600 North Sherman Drive Indianapolis Indiana 46206 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/43] | For all designated states THOMSON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS, INC. 600 North Sherman Drive Indianapolis Indiana 46206 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Neal, Charles Bailey 295 Camden Drive Indianapolis, Indiana 46077 / US | [1990/43] | Representative(s) | Pratt, Richard Wilson, et al London Patent Operation G.E. Technical Services Co. Inc. Essex House 12/13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/43] | Pratt, Richard Wilson, et al London Patent Operation G.E. Technical Services Co. Inc. Essex House 12/13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | Application number, filing date | 90304011.1 | 12.04.1990 | [1990/43] | Priority number, date | US19890339847 | 18.04.1989 Original published format: US 339847 | [1990/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0393946 | Date: | 24.10.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0393946 | Date: | 27.12.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0393946 | Date: | 19.07.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.11.1991 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/59 | [1990/43] | CPC: |
H04N5/45 (EP,US);
H04N9/18 (KR);
H04N5/57 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1994/49] |
Former [1990/43] | AT, BE, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE | Title | German: | Videosignalsteuerschaltung | [1990/43] | English: | Video control circuit | [1990/43] | French: | Circuit de commande du signal vidéo | [1990/43] | Examination procedure | 24.06.1992 | Examination requested [1992/34] | 10.06.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.10.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.01.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 30.01.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.04.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]GB2035019 (RCA CORP); | [AD]US4253110 (HARWOOD LEOPOLD A, et al); | [A]EP0108851 (SHARP KK [JP]) |