EP0393972 - Lesion location device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.01.1996 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): NL | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Urie, Robert Graham 3 Orchard Grove Flackwell Heath Buckinghamshire HP10 9PT / GB | For all designated states Ellis, Ian Ogilvie Yew Tree House, 2 Kenilworth Road The Park Nottingham NG7 1DS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/43] | For all designated states Urie, Robert Graham 3 Orchard Grove Flackwell Heath, Buckinghamshire HP10 9PT / GB | ||
For all designated states Ellis, Ian Ogilvie Yew Tree House, 2 Kenilworth Road The Park, Nottingham NG7 1DS / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1990/43] | Representative(s) | Bassett, Richard Simon, et al Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/43] | Bassett, Richard Simon, et al ERIC POTTER & CLARKSON St. Mary's Court St. Mary's Gate Nottingham NG1 1LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 90304084.8 | 17.04.1990 | [1990/43] | Priority number, date | GB19890008575 | 15.04.1989 Original published format: GB 8908575 | [1990/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0393972 | Date: | 24.10.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0393972 | Date: | 15.03.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.08.1990 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/34, A61B19/00 | [1990/43] | CPC: |
A61B90/39 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00349 (EP,US);
A61B2090/3908 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1990/43] | Title | German: | Ortungsvorrichtung für Läsion | [1990/43] | English: | Lesion location device | [1990/43] | French: | Dispositif pour localiser une lésion | [1990/43] | Examination procedure | 27.04.1990 | Examination requested [1990/43] | 08.07.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.01.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.09.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.12.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 14.12.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.12.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.03.1995 | BE | 15.03.1995 | CH | 15.03.1995 | DK | 15.03.1995 | ES | 15.03.1995 | GR | 15.03.1995 | IT | 15.03.1995 | LI | 15.03.1995 | NL | 15.03.1995 | SE | 15.06.1995 | [2003/11] |
Former [2002/24] | AT | 15.03.1995 | |
BE | 15.03.1995 | ||
CH | 15.03.1995 | ||
DK | 15.03.1995 | ||
ES | 15.03.1995 | ||
GR | 15.03.1995 | ||
IT | 15.03.1995 | ||
LI | 15.03.1995 | ||
NL | 30.04.1995 | ||
SE | 15.06.1995 | ||
Former [2000/27] | AT | 15.03.1995 | |
BE | 15.03.1995 | ||
CH | 15.03.1995 | ||
DK | 15.03.1995 | ||
GR | 15.03.1995 | ||
IT | 15.03.1995 | ||
LI | 15.03.1995 | ||
NL | 30.04.1995 | ||
SE | 15.06.1995 | ||
Former [2000/04] | AT | 15.03.1995 | |
BE | 15.03.1995 | ||
CH | 15.03.1995 | ||
DK | 15.03.1995 | ||
GR | 15.03.1995 | ||
IT | 15.03.1995 | ||
LI | 15.03.1995 | ||
SE | 15.06.1995 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 15.03.1995 | |
BE | 15.03.1995 | ||
CH | 15.03.1995 | ||
DK | 15.03.1995 | ||
IT | 15.03.1995 | ||
LI | 15.03.1995 | ||
SE | 15.06.1995 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 15.03.1995 | |
BE | 15.03.1995 | ||
CH | 15.03.1995 | ||
DK | 15.03.1995 | ||
LI | 15.03.1995 | ||
SE | 15.06.1995 | ||
Former [1996/04] | AT | 15.03.1995 | |
BE | 15.03.1995 | ||
CH | 15.03.1995 | ||
LI | 15.03.1995 | ||
SE | 15.06.1995 | ||
Former [1996/02] | AT | 15.03.1995 | |
CH | 15.03.1995 | ||
LI | 15.03.1995 | ||
Former [1995/36] | CH | 15.03.1995 | |
LI | 15.03.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3836776 (GULLEKSON E); | [A]US4582061 (FRY FRANCIS J [US]); | [A]US4774948 (MARKHAM CHARLES W [US]) |