EP0395306 - Infra-red baking oven [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.11.1995 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE G.S. BLODGETT CO., INC. 50 Lakeside Avenue Burlington Vermont 05402 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/52] | For all designated states THE G.S. BLODGETT CO., INC. 50 Lakeside Avenue Burlington Vermont 05402 / US | ||
Former [1990/44] | For all designated states G.S. BLODGETT CO., INC. 50 Lakeside Avenue Burlington Vermont 05402 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Alden, Lorne B. 13 Martindale West Shelburne, Vermont 05482 / US | [1990/44] | Representative(s) | Warren, Keith Stanley, et al Baron Warren Redfern Cambridge House 100 Cambridge Grove Hammersmith, London W6 0LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/44] | Warren, Keith Stanley, et al BARON & WARREN 18 South End Kensington London W8 5BU / GB | Application number, filing date | 90304215.8 | 19.04.1990 | [1990/44] | Priority number, date | US19890340747 | 20.04.1989 Original published format: US 340747 | [1990/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0395306 | Date: | 31.10.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0395306 | Date: | 24.07.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0395306 | Date: | 28.12.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.06.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A47J37/06, A47J37/04, F24C7/04 | [1991/35] | CPC: |
A47J37/0629 (EP,US);
A47J37/046 (EP,US);
A47J37/0623 (EP,US);
A47J37/0658 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1990/44] | A47J37/04, A47J37/06 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1990/44] | Title | German: | Infrarot-Backofen | [1994/52] | English: | Infra-red baking oven | [1990/44] | French: | Four de cuisson à infrarouge | [1990/44] |
Former [1990/44] | Intrarot-Backofen | Examination procedure | 20.09.1991 | Examination requested [1991/47] | 30.08.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.01.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.06.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.09.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 09.09.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.09.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 28.12.1994 | DK | 28.12.1994 | ES | 28.12.1994 | IT | 28.12.1994 | LI | 28.12.1994 | NL | 28.12.1994 | SE | 28.03.1995 | [2002/24] |
Former [1999/42] | CH | 28.12.1994 | |
DK | 28.12.1994 | ||
IT | 28.12.1994 | ||
LI | 28.12.1994 | ||
NL | 28.12.1994 | ||
SE | 28.03.1995 | ||
Former [1998/15] | CH | 28.12.1994 | |
DK | 28.12.1994 | ||
LI | 28.12.1994 | ||
NL | 28.12.1994 | ||
SE | 28.03.1995 | ||
Former [1997/17] | CH | 28.12.1994 | |
LI | 28.12.1994 | ||
NL | 28.12.1994 | ||
SE | 28.03.1995 | ||
Former [1995/49] | CH | 28.12.1994 | |
LI | 28.12.1994 | ||
NL | 28.12.1994 | ||
SE | 28.03.1995 | ||
Former [1995/42] | CH | 28.12.1994 | |
LI | 28.12.1994 | ||
SE | 28.03.1995 | ||
Former [1995/32] | CH | 28.12.1994 | |
LI | 28.12.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4164643 (DEWITT DAVID P [US], et al); | [A]US2860225 (AUGUST STEEN CARL); | [A]GB2021396 (PLASTICS INC); | [A]GB2180637 (THORN EMI APPLIANCES) |