EP0409376 - Method and apparatus for detecting surface flaws in electrical cable plastic jacketing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.03.1994 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.05.1994 [1994/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AT&T Corp. 32 Avenue of the Americas New York, NY 10013-2412 / US | [1991/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LaGrotta, Richard Thomas 13 Sherwood Place West Orange, New Jersey 07052 / US | [1991/04] | Representative(s) | Johnston, Kenneth Graham, et al Lucent Technologies EUR-IP UK Ltd Unit 18, Core 3 Workzone Innova Business Park Electric Avenue Enfield, EN3 7XB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/04] | Johnston, Kenneth Graham, et al AT&T (UK) LTD. AT&T Intellectual Property Division 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex, IG8 OTU / GB | Application number, filing date | 90304252.1 | 20.04.1990 | [1991/04] | Priority number, date | US19890374371 | 30.06.1989 Original published format: US 374371 | [1991/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0409376 | Date: | 23.01.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0409376 | Date: | 03.07.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.05.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G01N19/08 | [1991/04] | CPC: |
G01N19/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | GB, NL [1991/04] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Gerät zur Detektierung von Oberflächenfehlern im Kunststoffmantel von elektrischen Kabeln | [1991/04] | English: | Method and apparatus for detecting surface flaws in electrical cable plastic jacketing | [1991/04] | French: | Méthode et dispositif pour la détection de défauts de surface dans les gaines en matière plastique des câbles électriques | [1991/04] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 03.12.1991 | Examination requested [1992/05] | 28.06.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.11.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/19] | 10.12.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1994/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB927076 (AKADEMIE DER WISSENSCHAFEN ZU); | [A]GB1143243 (SIEMENS AG); | [Y]CH527409 (FISCHER AG GEORG [CH]); | [A]FR2324381 (CITIZEN WATCH CO LTD [JP], et al); | [Y]US4098408 (MILLER JR WILLIAM H, et al); | [A]GB2095826 (MANNESMANN AG) | [A] - J. PHYS. E: SCI. INSTRUM., vol. 20, no. 10, October 1987, pages 1145-1155, Bristol, GB; D.J. WHITEHOUSE: "Surface metrology instrumentation" |