EP0395368 - Quadrature phase demodulator capable of operating under a wide input dynamic range [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.06.1997 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.08.1997 [1997/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/44] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tomita, Hideho, c/o NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [1997/11] |
Former [1990/44] | 01 /
Tomita, Mideho, c/o NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Representative(s) | Jackson, David Spence, et al Reddie & Grose LLP 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/44] | Jackson, David Spence, et al REDDIE & GROSE 16, Theobalds Road London, WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 90304414.7 | 25.04.1990 | [1990/44] | Priority number, date | JP19890106230 | 25.04.1989 Original published format: JP 10623089 | [1990/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0395368 | Date: | 31.10.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0395368 | Date: | 28.08.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0395368 | Date: | 14.08.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.07.1991 | Classification | IPC: | H03D1/22 | [1990/44] | CPC: |
H03D1/2245 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, NL, SE [1990/44] | Title | German: | Quadratur-Phasendemodulator für einen breiten dynamischen Bereich | [1990/44] | English: | Quadrature phase demodulator capable of operating under a wide input dynamic range | [1990/44] | French: | Démodulateur de phase en quadrature capable de fonctionner dans une large gamme dynamique | [1990/44] | Examination procedure | 17.05.1990 | Examination requested [1990/44] | 18.04.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.10.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.04.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.07.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.09.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.12.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 20.12.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.05.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP62216505 ; | [A]JP63142708 ; | [AP]EP0320918 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 12, no. 77 (E-589), 10th March 1988; & JP-A-62 216 505 (TOSHIBA CORP.) 24-09-1987, & JP62216505 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 12, no. 402 (E-673), 25th October 1988; & JP-A-63 142 708 (NEC CORP.) 15-06-1988, & JP63142708 A 00000000 | [A] - IEEE 1988 INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS, DIGEST OF TECHNICAL PAPERS, Rosemont, Illinois, 8th - 10th June 1988, pages 22-23, IEEE, New York, US; M. HAGIWARA et al.: "DSP type coherent DSB signal detector using new phase synchronizer" |