EP0398520 - Aerosol package having compressed gas propellant and vapor tap of minute size [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.12.1992 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.12.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.02.1993 [1993/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gilroy, Gordon C RFD2 Darby Lane Bedford New Hampshire 03102 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/47] | For all designated states Gilroy, Gordon C RFD2 Darby Lane Bedford, New Hampshire 03102 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1990/47] | Representative(s) | Woodcraft, David Charles, et al Brookes Batchellor 102-108 Clerkenwell Road London EC1M 5SA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/47] | Woodcraft, David Charles, et al BROOKES & MARTIN High Holborn House 52/54 High Holborn London, WC1V 6SE / GB | Application number, filing date | 90304417.0 | 25.04.1990 | [1990/47] | Priority number, date | US19890354125 | 18.05.1989 Original published format: US 354125 | [1990/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0398520 | Date: | 22.11.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.09.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B65D83/14 | [1990/47] | CPC: |
B65D83/44 (EP,US);
B05B7/0483 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1990/47] | Title | German: | Aerosoldose mit unter Druck gesetztem Treibgas und einer kleinen, im Ventilgehäuse angeordneten Drosselbohrung | [1990/47] | English: | Aerosol package having compressed gas propellant and vapor tap of minute size | [1990/47] | French: | Dispositif distributeur d'aérosol chargé de gaz comprimé avec perçage de petite taille dans le boisseau de valve | [1990/47] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 06.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/05] | 11.09.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.02.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 12.08.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/06] | 14.09.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1993/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4019657 (SPITZER JOSEPH GEORGE, et al); | [Y]US4247025 (GAILITIS ADOLPH R) |