EP0396315 - Thermal ink jet printhead with bubble generating heating elements [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.09.1994 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.09.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.11.1994 [1994/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Xerox Square - 020 Rochester New York 14644 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/45] | For all designated states XEROX CORPORATION Xerox Square - 020 Rochester New York 14644 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Deshpande, Narayan V. 101 Highledge Drive Penfield, New York 14526 / US | [1990/45] | Representative(s) | Hill, Cecilia Ann, et al Rank Xerox Ltd Patent Department Parkway Marlow Buckinghamshire SL7 1YL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/45] | Hill, Cecilia Ann, et al Rank Xerox Ltd Patent Department Parkway Marlow Buckinghamshire SL7 1YL / GB | Application number, filing date | 90304463.4 | 25.04.1990 | [1990/45] | Priority number, date | US19890346056 | 01.05.1989 Original published format: US 346056 | [1990/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0396315 | Date: | 07.11.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0396315 | Date: | 24.11.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.08.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/05, B41J2/14 | [1990/45] | CPC: |
B41J2/14129 (EP,US);
B41J2002/14379 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1990/45] | Title | German: | Wärmetintenstrahldruckknopf mit Blasen erzeugenden Heizelementen | [1990/45] | English: | Thermal ink jet printhead with bubble generating heating elements | [1990/45] | French: | Tête d'impression thermique à jet d'encre avec des éléments chauffants générant des bulles | [1990/45] | Examination procedure | 02.05.1991 | Examination requested [1991/27] | 21.01.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.05.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.06.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 02.06.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.08.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4339762 (SHIRATO YOSHIAKI, et al); | [A]EP0110494 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]); | [A]EP0124312 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]); | [A]DE3717294 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]); | [A]EP0267567 (CANON KK [JP]) |