EP0403061 - A single-board computer incorporating programmable logic devices and its use in the automatic implementation and testing of logic circuits [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.08.1994 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.10.1994 [1994/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KAWASAKI STEEL CORPORATION No. 1-28, 1-Chome Kitahonmachi-Dori Chuo-Ku, Kobe-City Hyogo 651 / JP | [1990/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Marui, Tomohiro 3-7-5 Fuchuu-cho, Fuchuu-shi Tokyo 183 / JP | 02 /
Ishida, Yoshihiro 1-14-8 Minami-cho, Chiba-shi Chiba 280 / JP | 03 /
Oka, Hiroyuki 2-20-6, Minami-cho, Chiba-shi Chiba 280 / JP | [1990/51] | Representative(s) | Stebbing, Timothy Charles, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/51] | Stebbing, Timothy Charles, et al Haseltine Lake & Co. Hazlitt House 28 Southampton Buildings Chancery Lane London WC2A 1AT / GB | Application number, filing date | 90304570.6 | 26.04.1990 | [1990/51] | Priority number, date | JP19890110493 | 27.04.1989 Original published format: JP 11049389 | JP19890112587 | 01.05.1989 Original published format: JP 11258789 | JP19890112588 | 01.05.1989 Original published format: JP 11258889 | [1990/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0403061 | Date: | 19.12.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0403061 | Date: | 27.12.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.11.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G06F15/60, G06F15/76 | [1991/35] | CPC: |
G06F30/331 (EP,US);
G06F9/06 (KR)
|
Former IPC [1990/51] | G06F15/60 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1990/51] | Title | German: | SBC unter Verwendung programmierbarer logischer Einrichtungen und dessen Benutzung zur automatisierten Ausführung und zum Test logischer Schaltungen | [1990/51] | English: | A single-board computer incorporating programmable logic devices and its use in the automatic implementation and testing of logic circuits | [1990/51] | French: | Ordinateur sur plaque unique incorporant les dispositifs à logique programmable et son utilisation pour l'exécution et la vérification automatique de circuit de logique | [1990/51] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 27.02.1992 | Examination requested [1992/17] | 17.12.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.04.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/42] | 26.05.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1994/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.1994 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US4364112 [ ] (ONODERA TORU, et al) |