EP0688582 - Bypassing double action rope grip [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.01.1997 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LATCHWAYS LIMITED 3 St. Mary Street Chippenham Wiltshire, SN15 3JL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/52] | For all designated states LATCHWAYS LIMITED 3 St. Mary Street Chippenham Wiltshire, SN15 3JL / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tupper, Alan William Leigh Delamere House, Leigh Delamere Chippenham, Wiltshire, SN14 6JZ / GB | [1995/52] | Representative(s) | Ben-Nathan, Laurence Albert, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord 30 Welbeck Street London W1G 8ER / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/52] | Ben-Nathan, Laurence Albert, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord 91 Wimpole Street London W1M 8AH / GB | Application number, filing date | 90304744.7 | 02.05.1985 | [1995/52] | Priority number, date | US19840606351 | 02.05.1984 Original published format: US 606351 | [1995/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0688582 | Date: | 27.12.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.10.1995 | Classification | IPC: | A62B35/04 | [1995/52] | CPC: |
A62B35/0087 (EP,US);
A62B35/04 (EP,US);
E04G21/3261 (EP,US);
E04G21/3295 (EP,US);
F16G11/105 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1995/52] | Title | German: | Überholender doppeltwirkender Seilgriff | [1995/52] | English: | Bypassing double action rope grip | [1995/52] | French: | Prise de corde outrepassante à double effet | [1995/52] | Examination procedure | 30.11.1990 | Request for decision received: division | 27.12.1990 | Result of request for decision (division): Request rejected | 27.06.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1997/12] | 22.10.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1997/12] | Appeal following examination | 19.02.1991 | Appeal received No. J0001/91 | 19.02.1991 | Statement of grounds filed | 25.08.1994 | Result of appeal procedure: allowance of appeal | Earlier application(s) Tooltip | EP85400859.6 / EP0163563 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 06.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 06.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 06.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 20.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 22.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 09.08.1996 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB2096959 (TUPPER ALAN WILLIAM) [Y] 1-5 * abstract * * page 3, line 67 - line 90 *; | [Y]US3179994 (MEYER ROY E, et al) [Y] 1-5 * figure - *; | [A]DE7726831U (FISCHER) [A] 1,5; | [A]US4077094 (SWAGER WILLIAM E) [A] 1,5; | [A]US4034828 (ROSE CLARENCE W, et al) [A] 1,5; | [A]DE3223278 (TUPPER ALAN WILLIAM [GB]) [A] 1,5; | [A]US3193050 (GASTONE GALANTE) [A] 1,5; | [AD]GB1077068 (BARROW HEPBURN & GALE LTD) [AD] 1,5; | [AD]US4265179 (TUPPER ALAN W, et al) [AD] 1,5 |