|
22.10.1996 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-payment of examination fee/designation fee/non-reply to Written Opinion) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.08.1996 |
Invitation to pay examination fee/designation fees with additional fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.10.1995 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.10.1995 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.02.1995 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.09.1994 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.08.1994 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
10 |
|
16.06.1994 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.06.1994 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.06.1994 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
38 |
|
23.11.1992 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.11.1992 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.11.1992 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
18 |
|
05.11.1992 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.11.1992 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.11.1992 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
05.11.1992 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
05.11.1992 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.11.1992 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
05.11.1992 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.11.1992 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
05.11.1992 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
05.11.1992 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
05.11.1992 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
05.11.1992 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
05.11.1992 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.11.1992 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
05.11.1992 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
29.10.1992 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.10.1992 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.10.1992 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.08.1992 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.08.1992 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.08.1992 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.07.1992 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.07.1992 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.06.1992 |
Letter Enlarged Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.06.1992 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.05.1992 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.03.1992 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
20 |
|
31.03.1992 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
20 |
|
15.10.1991 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.09.1991 |
Letter Legal Board, with references of sender |
Appeal |
3 |
|
03.06.1991 |
F3203 Composition of the Board (J) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.03.1991 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.02.1991 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.02.1991 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.02.1991 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.02.1991 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
25.02.1991 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.02.1991 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
18 |
|
25.02.1991 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.02.1991 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
19.02.1991 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
4 |
|
07.01.1991 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.12.1990 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
04.12.1990 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.11.1990 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.11.1990 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.11.1990 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.11.1990 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
30.05.1990 |
Application refused (formal requirement not fulfilled) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.05.1990 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.05.1990 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
01.05.1990 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
01.05.1990 |
Description |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
01.05.1990 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.05.1990 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.05.1990 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.05.1990 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
01.05.1990 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
02.05.1985 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
02.05.1985 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
02.05.1985 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
02.05.1985 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
02.05.1985 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
02.05.1985 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
02.05.1985 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
02.05.1985 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
02.05.1985 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.05.1985 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
02.05.1985 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
02.05.1985 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
02.05.1985 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
02.05.1985 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
02.05.1985 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
02.05.1985 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
02.05.1985 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
02.05.1985 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
02.05.1985 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
02.05.1985 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.05.1985 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
24 |