EP0398599 - Yarn carrier with anti-nesting rib [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.07.1992 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.07.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.09.1992 [1992/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CONITEX, INC. 1302 Industrial Pike Gastonia North Carolina 28053 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/47] | For all designated states CONITEX, INC. 1302 Industrial Pike Gastonia, North Carolina 28053 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Israel, Fernandez 3311 Tamworth Lane Gastonia North Carolina 28054 / US | [1990/47] | Representative(s) | Lees, Clifford, et al APPLEYARD, LEES & CO. 15, Clare Road Halifax West Yorkshire, HX1 2HY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/47] | Lees, Clifford, et al APPLEYARD, LEES & CO. 15, Clare Road Halifax West Yorkshire, HX1 2HY / GB | Application number, filing date | 90305111.8 | 11.05.1990 | [1990/47] | Priority number, date | US19890351729 | 15.05.1989 Original published format: US 351729 | [1990/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0398599 | Date: | 22.11.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.08.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B65H75/10 | [1990/47] | CPC: |
B65H75/10 (EP,US);
B65H2701/31 (EP,US);
B65H2701/534 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, IT [1990/47] | Title | German: | Garnhülse mit Antiklemm-Rippe | [1990/47] | English: | Yarn carrier with anti-nesting rib | [1990/47] | French: | Canette pour filés avec nervure antiarrêt | [1990/47] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 01.05.1991 | Examination requested [1991/27] | 06.06.1991 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 16.09.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 16.09.1991 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 25.11.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 02.12.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.03.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/37] | 16.04.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1992/37] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.06.1992 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4742972 (ROST KARL H [US], et al); | [A]US4176811 (BECKER JOSEF [DE], et al); | [A]DE2048885 ; | [A]CH607981 (SCHWEITER AG MASCHF [CH]); | [A]US3675871 (HEYDEN HERBERT FRANK); | [A]DE3643819 (LANGEN MANFRED [DE], et al) |