EP0398713 - Photosensitive resin composition and laminate using the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.05.1995 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.05.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.07.1995 [1995/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi Chemical Co., Ltd. 1-1, Nishishinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/47] | For all designated states Hitachi Chemical Co., Ltd. 1-1, Nishishinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo 160 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kawaguchi, Taku, Shimizu Apartment 1-101 1-12 Nishinarusawacho-2-chome Hitachi-shi / JP | 02 /
Minami, Yoshitaka Hirasawa Terasu 16-2, 19-4-2 Takasuzucho 1-chome Hitachi-shi / JP | 03 /
Ichikawa, Tatsuya Yamasakiryo, 2-9 Higashicho 4-chome Hitachi-shi / JP | [1990/47] | Representative(s) | Cresswell, Thomas Anthony, et al J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/47] | Cresswell, Thomas Anthony, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 90305333.8 | 17.05.1990 | [1990/47] | Priority number, date | JP19890124978 | 18.05.1989 Original published format: JP 12497889 | [1990/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0398713 | Date: | 22.11.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0398713 | Date: | 24.07.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0398713 | Date: | 20.07.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.06.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/085, G03F7/027 | [1990/47] | CPC: |
G03F7/085 (EP,US);
Y10S430/111 (EP,US);
Y10S430/12 (EP,US);
Y10S430/121 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB [1990/47] | Title | German: | Lichtempfindliche Harzzusammensetzung und Laminat unter Verwendung dieser Zusammensetzung | [1990/47] | English: | Photosensitive resin composition and laminate using the same | [1990/47] | French: | Composition résineuse photosensible et stratifié employant cette composition | [1990/47] | Examination procedure | 26.09.1991 | Examination requested [1991/48] | 28.07.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.12.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.02.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 25.02.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.04.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]JP61223836 ; | [A]GB2062647 (HERCULES INC); | [Y]DE3600442 (PHOTOPOLY OHKA CO [JP]); | [AD]EP0247549 (DU PONT [US]) | [YD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 11, no. 58 (P-550)(2505) 21 February 1987, & JP-A-61 223836 (HITACHI CHEM CO.) 04 October 1986,, & JP61223836 A 19861004 |