EP0404339 - Routing apparatus and method for high-speed mesh connected local area network [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.11.1998 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.2004 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): LU | published on 15.09.2004 [2004/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DIGITAL EQUIPMENT CORPORATION 111 Powdermill Road Maynard Massachusetts 01754-1418 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/52] | For all designated states DIGITAL EQUIPMENT CORPORATION 111 Powdermill Road Maynard Massachusetts 01754-1418 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Thacker, Charles P. 543 Tennyson Avenue Palo Alto, California 94301 / US | 02 /
Stewart, Lawrence C. 2420 Greer Road Palo Alto, California 94303 / US | [1990/52] | Representative(s) | Goodman, Christopher, et al Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/52] | Goodman, Christopher, et al Eric Potter & Clarkson St. Mary's Court St. Mary's Gate Nottingham NG1 1LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 90305358.5 | 17.05.1990 | [1990/52] | Priority number, date | US19890370248 | 22.06.1989 Original published format: US 370248 | [1990/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0404339 | Date: | 27.12.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0404339 | Date: | 03.08.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0404339 | Date: | 07.01.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.06.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G06F15/16 | [1998/02] | CPC: |
G06F15/17381 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1994/28] | G06F15/16, H04L12/56 | ||
Former IPC [1990/52] | G06F15/16 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/52] | Title | German: | Leitweglenkungsvorrichtung und -verfahren für lokales Maschennetzwerk hoher Geschwindigkeit | [1998/02] | English: | Routing apparatus and method for high-speed mesh connected local area network | [1990/52] | French: | Appareil et méthode de montage pour réseau local maillé à haute vitesse | [1990/52] |
Former [1990/52] | Leitwegslenkungsvorrichtung und -verfahren für lokales Maschennetzwerk hoher Geschwindigkeit | Examination procedure | 25.05.1990 | Examination requested [1990/52] | 19.04.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.08.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.07.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.09.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 19.09.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.10.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/53] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.01.1998 | BE | 07.01.1998 | CH | 07.01.1998 | ES | 07.01.1998 | GR | 07.01.1998 | LI | 07.01.1998 | NL | 07.01.1998 | DK | 07.04.1998 | SE | 07.04.1998 | LU | 17.05.1998 | [2004/38] |
Former [2003/45] | AT | 07.01.1998 | |
BE | 07.01.1998 | ||
CH | 07.01.1998 | ||
ES | 07.01.1998 | ||
GR | 07.01.1998 | ||
LI | 07.01.1998 | ||
NL | 07.01.1998 | ||
DK | 07.04.1998 | ||
SE | 07.04.1998 | ||
LU | 31.05.1998 | ||
Former [2003/07] | AT | 07.01.1998 | |
BE | 07.01.1998 | ||
CH | 07.01.1998 | ||
ES | 07.01.1998 | ||
GR | 07.01.1998 | ||
LI | 07.01.1998 | ||
NL | 07.01.1998 | ||
SE | 07.04.1998 | ||
LU | 31.05.1998 | ||
Former [2002/24] | AT | 07.01.1998 | |
BE | 07.01.1998 | ||
CH | 07.01.1998 | ||
ES | 07.01.1998 | ||
GR | 07.01.1998 | ||
LI | 07.01.1998 | ||
SE | 07.04.1998 | ||
LU | 31.05.1998 | ||
Former [2000/04] | AT | 07.01.1998 | |
BE | 07.01.1998 | ||
CH | 07.01.1998 | ||
GR | 07.01.1998 | ||
LI | 07.01.1998 | ||
SE | 07.04.1998 | ||
LU | 31.05.1998 | ||
Former [1998/49] | AT | 07.01.1998 | |
BE | 07.01.1998 | ||
CH | 07.01.1998 | ||
LI | 07.01.1998 | ||
SE | 07.04.1998 | ||
Former [1998/43] | AT | 07.01.1998 | |
CH | 07.01.1998 | ||
LI | 07.01.1998 | ||
SE | 07.04.1998 | ||
Former [1998/40] | AT | 07.01.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0206512 (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC [US]) [A] 1,4,7* column 3, line 8 - line 50 *; | [A]EP0224229 (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]) [A] 1,4,7 * column 2, line 45 - column 5, line 32 * | [A] - K. BRAYER, "SURVIVABLE COMPUTER COMMUNICATION ROUTING USING DECENTRALIZED CONTROL", IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON CIRCUITS AND COMPUTERS ICCC 82, NEW YORK, USA, (198209), pages 93 - 97 [A] 1,4,7 * page 94, column R * | [A] - SCHWARTZ ET AL., "ROUTING TECHNIQUES USED IN COMPUTER COMMUNICATION NETWORKS", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON COMMUNICATIONS, NEW YORK US, (198004), vol. 28, no. 4, pages 539 - 552 [A] 1,4,7 * page 549, column R, paragraph 2 * | [A] - HSIEH ET AL., "HOW GOOD IS YOUR NETWORK ROUTING PROTOCOL ?", DATA COMMUNICATIONS, NEW YORK US, (198405), vol. 13, no. 5, pages 231 - 248 [A] 1,4,7 * page 242, paragraph 1 * |