EP0405739 - Wire belt fastener [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.10.1994 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.10.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.11.1994 [1994/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FLEXIBLE STEEL LACING COMPANY 2525 Wisconsin Avenue Downers Grove, IL 60515 / US | [1991/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Musil, Edward Charles 4142 Fisherman Terrace Lyons, Illinois 60534 / US | [1991/01] | Representative(s) | Bayliss, Geoffrey Cyril, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/01] | Bayliss, Geoffrey Cyril, et al BOULT, WADE & TENNANT 27 Furnival Street London EC4A 1PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 90305369.2 | 17.05.1990 | [1991/01] | Priority number, date | US19890371214 | 26.06.1989 Original published format: US 371214 | [1991/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0405739 | Date: | 02.01.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0405739 | Date: | 01.12.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.10.1990 | Classification | IPC: | F16G3/02 | [1991/01] | CPC: |
F16G3/02 (EP,US);
Y10T24/1632 (EP,US);
Y10T24/1636 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1991/01] | Title | German: | Riemenverbinder aus Draht | [1991/01] | English: | Wire belt fastener | [1991/01] | French: | Attache de courroie en fil métallique | [1991/01] | Examination procedure | 01.02.1991 | Examination requested [1991/14] | 02.02.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.03.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.05.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.06.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.08.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 16.08.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.09.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB476976 (ALBERT EDWARD WARBY, et al); | [A]GB725897 (EWALD RUDOLF TIMMERBEIL); | [AD]US3153827 (JOHN PHILLIPS, et al); | [AD]US3962754 (STOLZ HERMANN); | [AD]US4060877 (SCHICK JEAN-FRANCOIS); | [A]GB2049871 (MATO MASCH & METALLWAREN); | [YD]GB2092031 (FENNER J & H CO LTD); | [AD]US4625369 (MUSIL EDWARD C [US]) |