EP0399842 - Emulsified preparations containing perfluorocarbon compound [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.08.1994 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.08.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.09.1994 [1994/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Green Cross Corporation 3-3, Imabashi 1-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/48] | For all designated states THE GREEN CROSS CORPORATION 3-3, Imabashi 1-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tsuda, Yoshio, c/o Chuo Kenkyusho The Green Cross Corp., 1180-1, Shodaiotani-2-chome Hirakata-shi / JP | 02 /
Murashima, Ryoichiro, c/o Chuo Kenkyusho The Green Cross Corp., 1180-1, Shodaiotani-2-chome Hirakata-shi / JP | 03 /
Yamanouchi, Kouichi, c/o Chuo Kenkyusho The Green Cross Corp., 1180-1, Shodaiotani-2-chome Hirakata-shi / JP | 04 /
Yokoyama, Kazumasa, c/o Chuo Kenkyusho The Green Cross Corp., 1180-1, Shodaiotani-2-chome Hirakata-shi / JP | [1990/48] | Representative(s) | Coleiro, Raymond, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/48] | Coleiro, Raymond, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 90305730.5 | 25.05.1990 | [1990/48] | Priority number, date | JP19890133948 | 26.05.1989 Original published format: JP 13394889 | [1990/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0399842 | Date: | 28.11.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0399842 | Date: | 31.07.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.06.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/435, A61K31/025, A61K9/107 | [1990/48] | CPC: |
A61K9/0026 (EP);
A61K31/28 (KR);
A61K31/47 (EP);
A61P7/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1990/48] | Title | German: | Emulsionen von Perfluorokohlenstoff | [1990/48] | English: | Emulsified preparations containing perfluorocarbon compound | [1990/48] | French: | Emulsions contenant des perfluorocarbones | [1990/48] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 05.11.1991 | Examination requested [1992/01] | 31.03.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.09.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 30.12.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.07.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 03.12.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 16.12.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.03.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/39] | 04.05.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1994/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.1994 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP61233615 ; | [YD]EP0080716 (GREEN CROSS CORP [JP]); | [Y]EP0307087 (LONG DAVID M JR); | [Y]EP0282948 (AIR PROD & CHEM [US]); | [Y]EP0282949 (AIR PROD & CHEM [US]); | [YD]US4252827 (YOKOYAMA KAZUMASA, et al); | [A]US3993581 (YOKOYAMA KAZUMASA, et al); | [A]US3958014 (WATANABE RYOZO, et al) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 11, no. 80 (C-409)(2527) 11 March 1987, & JP-A-61 233615 (THE GREEN CROSS CORPORATION) 17 October 1986,, & JP61233615 A 19861017 |