EP0403166 - Multi-directional light control film [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.02.1996 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.03.1996 [1996/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/51] | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bellus, Peter A, c/o Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Company 2501 Hudson Road P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul Minnesota 55133 / US | [1990/51] | Representative(s) | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/51] | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al c/o Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90306244.6 | 08.06.1990 | [1990/51] | Priority number, date | US19890367489 | 16.06.1989 Original published format: US 367489 | [1990/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0403166 | Date: | 19.12.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0403166 | Date: | 06.11.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0403166 | Date: | 29.03.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.09.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B29D11/00 | [1990/51] | CPC: |
G09F19/14 (EP,KR,US);
B29C39/00 (EP,KR,US);
B29C70/62 (EP,KR,US);
B29D11/00 (EP,KR,US);
B29K2105/126 (EP,KR,US);
B29K2105/18 (EP,KR,US);
Y10T428/25 (EP,US);
Y10T428/256 (EP,US);
Y10T428/257 (EP,US);
Y10T428/258 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1990/51] | Title | German: | Folie zur Kontrolle von Multi-Richtstrahlen von Licht | [1990/51] | English: | Multi-directional light control film | [1990/51] | French: | Feuille pour le contrôle de la lumière multidirectionnelle | [1990/51] | Examination procedure | 27.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/09] | 29.07.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.02.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.05.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.09.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.12.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 27.12.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.12.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3679451 (MARKS ALVIN M, et al); | [A]US3708622 (LONG G, et al); | [A]US3582189 (MORITZ SCOTT NO, et al); | [AD]US4128685 (LOWREY ROBERT D, et al); | [AD]US3441408 (SCHLADITZ HERMANN J); | [AD]US3222515 (ORR JOHN B); | [AD]US3510829 (KELLER JOSEPH RICHARD); | [AD]US4273807 (BERRY KENNETH L); | [AD]US3922440 (WEGWERTH ARTHUR A, et al); | [AD]US3955962 (DAWIHL WALTER, et al); | [AD]US1955923 (HERBERT LAND EDWIN) |