EP0405778 - Disc brake caliper housing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 02.02.1993 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 20.08.2008 [2008/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL MOTORS FRANCE 56 à 68 Avenue Louis Roche F-92231 Gennevilliers Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1991/01] | For all designated states GENERAL MOTORS FRANCE 56 à 68 Avenue Louis Roche F-92231 Gennevilliers Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schonenberger, Eric 9 Rue Phillipe de Metz F-92270 Bois Colombes / FR | [1991/01] | Representative(s) | Denton, Michael John, et al Delphi France SAS Bât. le Raspail - ZAC Paris Nord 2 22, avenue des Nations CS 65059 Villepinte 95972 Roissy CDG Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1991/01] | Denton, Michael John, et al Patent Section 1st Floor Gideon House 28 Chapel Street Luton Bedfordshire LU1 2SE / GB | Application number, filing date | 90306278.4 | 08.06.1990 | [1991/01] | Priority number, date | GB19890014730 | 27.06.1989 Original published format: GB 8914730 | [1991/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0405778 | Date: | 02.01.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.09.1990 | Classification | IPC: | F16D55/226 | [1991/01] | CPC: |
F16D55/226 (EP,US);
F16D65/092 (KR);
F16D2055/0016 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/01] | Title | German: | Sattelgehäuse einer Scheibenbremse | [1991/01] | English: | Disc brake caliper housing | [1991/01] | French: | Corps d'étrier d'un frein à disque | [1991/01] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 16.01.1991 | Examination requested [1991/14] | 18.05.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 28.10.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1993/12] | 07.11.1992 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1993/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]GB2076914 (NISSAN MOTOR); | [A]GB2177171 (KELSEY HAYES CO [US]); | [A]GB1565773 (BENDIX CORP); | [AP]EP0359548 (AUSTRALIA BRAKE & CLUTCH IND [AU]) |