EP0413417 - Hair conditioning shampoo [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.01.1996 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Colgate-Palmolive Company 300 Park Avenue New York, NY 10022 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Colgate-Palmolive Company 300 Park Avenue New York NY 10022-7499 / US | ||
Former [1991/08] | For all designated states Colgate-Palmolive Company 300 Park Avenue New York, N.Y. 10022-7499 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hartnett, Donna A. 30 Pullman Loop Dayton, New Jersey / US | 02 /
Patel, Amrit M. 35 Wetherhill Way Dayton, New Jersey / US | 03 /
Reich, Charles 257 Karsey Street Highland Park, New Jersey / US | 04 /
Robbins, Clarence R. 1726 Woodfield Road Martinsville, New Jersey / US | [1991/12] |
Former [1991/08] | 01 /
Hartnett, Donna A. 30 Pullman Loop Dayton, New Jersey / US | ||
02 /
Patel, Amrit M. 35 Wetherhill Way Dayton, New Jersey / US | |||
03 /
Reich, Charles 247 Karley Street Highland Park, New Jersey / US | |||
04 /
Robbins, Clarence R. 1726 Woodfield Road Martinsville, New Jersey / US | Representative(s) | Kearney, Kevin David Nicholas, et al KILBURN & STRODE 20 Red Lion Street London, WC1R 4PJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/08] | Kearney, Kevin David Nicholas, et al KILBURN & STRODE 30 John Street London, WC1N 2DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 90306365.9 | 12.06.1990 | [1991/08] | Priority number, date | US19890369361 | 21.06.1989 Original published format: US 369361 | US19890432644 | 07.11.1989 Original published format: US 432644 | US19890432952 | 07.11.1989 Original published format: US 432952 | US19900507335 | 09.04.1990 Original published format: US 507335 | US19900507328 | 09.04.1990 Original published format: US 507328 | [1991/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0413417 | Date: | 20.02.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0413417 | Date: | 14.08.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0413417 | Date: | 08.02.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/08, A61K7/06 | [1991/08] | CPC: |
A61Q19/10 (EP);
A61K8/31 (EP);
A61K8/342 (EP);
A61K8/39 (EP);
A61K8/416 (EP);
A61K8/44 (EP);
A61K8/463 (EP);
A61K8/73 (EP);
A61K8/731 (EP);
A61K8/8194 (EP);
A61K8/891 (EP);
A61K8/898 (EP);
A61Q5/02 (EP);
A61Q5/06 (EP);
A61Q5/12 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/08] | Title | German: | Haarpflegendes Shampoo | [1991/08] | English: | Hair conditioning shampoo | [1991/08] | French: | Shampooing conditionnant les cheveux | [1991/08] | Examination procedure | 27.06.1990 | Examination requested [1991/08] | 25.02.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.08.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.09.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.01.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.04.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.08.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.10.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 26.10.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.11.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.02.1995 | BE | 08.02.1995 | ES | 08.02.1995 | NL | 08.02.1995 | GB | 12.06.1995 | CH | 30.06.1995 | LI | 30.06.1995 | LU | 30.06.1995 | [2002/24] |
Former [2000/06] | AT | 08.02.1995 | |
BE | 08.02.1995 | ||
NL | 08.02.1995 | ||
GB | 12.06.1995 | ||
CH | 30.06.1995 | ||
LI | 30.06.1995 | ||
LU | 30.06.1995 | ||
Former [1997/13] | AT | 08.02.1995 | |
BE | 08.02.1995 | ||
NL | 08.02.1995 | ||
GB | 12.06.1995 | ||
CH | 30.06.1995 | ||
LI | 30.06.1995 | ||
Former [1996/30] | AT | 08.02.1995 | |
BE | 08.02.1995 | ||
NL | 08.02.1995 | ||
GB | 12.06.1995 | ||
Former [1996/04] | AT | 08.02.1995 | |
BE | 08.02.1995 | ||
NL | 08.02.1995 | ||
Former [1995/49] | AT | 08.02.1995 | |
NL | 08.02.1995 | ||
Former [1995/40] | AT | 08.02.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]EP0208533 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]); | [YD]GB2193971 (COLGATE PALMOLIVE CO); | [AD]US4728457 (FIELER GEORGE M [US], et al); | [A]EP0294894 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]); | [Y]EP0314141 (KAO CORP [JP]) |