EP0414347 - Belt grinding machine for analytical specimens [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 03.05.1994 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.1994 | Refusal of application | published on 22.06.1994 [1994/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BCIRA Alvechurch Birmingham, B48 7QB / GB | [1991/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
George, Christopher Louis Francis 253 Pennine Road, Lowes Hill Bromsgrove, Wors B61 0TN / GB | 02 /
McCormack, William 35 Gunners Lane Studley, Warwickshire B80 7LU / GB | [1991/09] | Representative(s) | Spall, Christopher John, et al Barker Brettell LLP 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 9PW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/14] | Spall, Christopher John, et al BARKER, BRETTELL & DUNCAN 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 9PW / GB | ||
Former [1991/09] | Duncan, Angus Henry Barker, Brettell & Duncan 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham, B16 9PW / GB | Application number, filing date | 90306423.6 | 13.06.1990 | [1991/09] | Priority number, date | GB19890013785 | 15.06.1989 Original published format: GB 8913785 | GB19890018302 | 10.08.1989 Original published format: GB 8918302 | [1991/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0414347 | Date: | 27.02.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.10.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G01N1/32, // B24B21/06 | [1991/09] | CPC: |
B24B21/04 (EP);
B24B21/10 (EP);
B24B41/06 (EP);
G01N1/32 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1991/09] | Title | German: | Bandschleifmaschine für Analysenproben | [1991/09] | English: | Belt grinding machine for analytical specimens | [1991/09] | French: | Ponceuse à bande pour échantillons pour analyse | [1991/09] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 09.08.1991 | Examination requested [1991/42] | 04.03.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.06.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.08.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 27.01.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1994/25] | 06.02.1994 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1994/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3892092 ; | [Y]US2586848 ; | [A]US2139952 ; | [A]DE2903962 |