EP0432869 - Head core slider for rigid magnetic disk drive and method of producing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 03.01.1996 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.01.1996 | Refusal of application | published on 24.01.1996 [1996/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NGK Insulators, Ltd. 2-56, Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1994/47] | For all designated states NGK INSULATORS, LTD. 2-56, Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi-ken / JP | ||
Former [1994/46] | For all designated states NGK INSULATORS, LTD. 2-56, Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi-ken / JP | ||
For all designated states APPLIED MAGNETICS CORPORATION 75 Robin Hill Road Goleta California 93117 / US | |||
Former [1991/25] | For all designated states NGK INSULATORS, LTD. 2-56, Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya City Aichi Pref. / JP | ||
For all designated states APPLIED MAGNETICS CORPORATION 75 Robin Hill Road Goleta California 93117 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Aronoff, Michael I. 234 Spruce Drive Goleta, California 93117 / US | 02 /
Terada, Nobuhiro 17-27 Shirayama-cho 7-chome Kasugai-shi, Aichi-ken, 487 / JP | 03 /
Matsuzawa, Soichiro 1000-13, Aza-Shinden, Ohaza-Rengeji Kuwana-shi, Mie-ken, 511 / JP | [1991/25] | Representative(s) | Paget, Hugh Charles Edward, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/06] | Paget, Hugh Charles Edward, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | ||
Former [1991/25] | Paget, Hugh Charles Edward MEWBURN ELLIS 2 Cursitor Street London EC4A 1BQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 90306746.0 | 20.06.1990 | [1991/25] | Priority number, date | US19890450566 | 14.12.1989 Original published format: US 450566 | [1991/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0432869 | Date: | 19.06.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0432869 | Date: | 17.07.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.05.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G11B5/127, G11B5/187, G11B5/133, G11B5/193, G11B5/23, G11B5/60 | [1991/27] | CPC: |
G11B5/6005 (EP,US);
G11B5/127 (KR);
G11B5/1871 (EP,US);
G11B5/23 (EP,US);
G11B5/4886 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49041 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1991/25] | G11B5/187, G11B5/60 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL [1991/25] | Title | German: | Gleitvorrichtung mit einem Abtastkopfkern für einen Festmagnetplattenspeicherantrieb und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung | [1991/25] | English: | Head core slider for rigid magnetic disk drive and method of producing the same | [1991/25] | French: | Glisseur avec noyau de tête pour un lecteur de disque magnétique rigide et sa méthode de production | [1991/25] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 06.08.1990 | Examination requested [1991/25] | 18.04.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.10.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 28.08.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1996/04] | 07.09.1995 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1996/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP62103820 ; | [A]JP57100620 ; | [A]JP62040605 ; | [A]JP62295207 ; | [A]JP62018615 ; | [A]JP63056806 ; | DE3731283 [ ] (HITACHI LTD [JP]); | DE3630841 [ ] (HITACHI METALS LTD [JP]) | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 11, no. 313 (P-626)(2760) 13 October 1987, & JP-A-62 103820 (HITACHI METALS LTD) 14 May 1987,, & JP62103820 A 19870514 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 6, no. 188 (P-144) 28 September 1982, & JP-A-57 100620 (HITACHI LTD) 22 June 1982,, & JP57100620 A 19820622 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 11, no. 226 (P-598) 23 July 1987, & JP-A-62 040605 (TOHOKU METAL IND LTD) 21 February 1987,, & JP62040605 A 19870221 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 12, no. 188 (P-711)(3035) 02 June 1988, & JP-A-62 295207 (HITACHI METALS LTD) 22 December 1987,, & JP62295207 A 19871222 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 11, no. 194 (P-588)(2641) 23 June 1987, & JP-A-62 018615 (NEC CORP.) 27 January 1987,, & JP62018615 A 19870127 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 12, no. 278 (P-738)(3125) 01 August 1988, & JP-A-63 056806 (SONY CORP.) 11 March 1988,, & JP63056806 A 19880311 |