EP0407131 - Contact [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.08.1995 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.08.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.09.1995 [1995/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yamaichi Electronics Co., Ltd. 28-7, Nakamagome 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1994/36] | For all designated states Yamaichi Electronics Co., Ltd. 28-7, Nakamagome 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [1991/02] | For all designated states YAMAICHI ELECTRIC MFG. CO. LTD.. 28-7, Nakamagome 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Matsuoka, Noriyuki 29-28, Ohi 4-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1991/02] | Representative(s) | Ben-Nathan, Laurence Albert, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord 30 Welbeck Street London W1G 8ER / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/02] | Ben-Nathan, Laurence Albert, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord 91 Wimpole Street London W1M 8AH / GB | Application number, filing date | 90307229.6 | 02.07.1990 | [1991/02] | Priority number, date | JP19890172691 | 04.07.1989 Original published format: JP 17269189 | [1991/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0407131 | Date: | 09.01.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0407131 | Date: | 28.08.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0407131 | Date: | 05.10.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.07.1991 | Classification | IPC: | H05K7/10 | [1991/02] | CPC: |
H05K7/1023 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1991/02] | Title | German: | Kontakt | [1991/02] | English: | Contact | [1991/02] | French: | Contact | [1991/02] | Examination procedure | 14.11.1991 | Examination requested [1992/02] | 18.03.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.07.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.12.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.03.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.04.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 23.04.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.07.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4494807 (COSMO NICOLA [US]); | [X]US4684184 (GRABBE DIMITRY G [US], et al); | [A]US4176895 (ALDRIDGE LIONEL D [US]); | [A]US4027935 (BYRNES HERBERT P, et al); | [AD]EP0040942 (AMP INC [US]) |