EP0408236 - Video transmission and control system utilizing internal telephone lines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.01.1999 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.02.1999 [1999/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INLINE CONNECTION CORPORATION 730 N. Danville Street Arlington, VA 22201 / US | [1991/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Goodman, David D. 730 N. Danville Street Arlington, VA 22201 / US | 02 /
Domnitz, Robert 594 Marrett Road Lexington, MA 02173 / US | [1991/03] | Representative(s) | Skone James, Robert Edmund, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/03] | Skone James, Robert Edmund, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 90307260.1 | 03.07.1990 | [1991/03] | Priority number, date | US19890379751 | 14.07.1989 Original published format: US 379751 | [1991/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0408236 | Date: | 16.01.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0408236 | Date: | 15.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0408236 | Date: | 04.03.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.02.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/10, H04N7/18, H04M11/00 | [1992/16] | CPC: |
H04N7/18 (EP,US);
H04H20/81 (EP,US);
H04L12/2803 (EP,US);
H04L12/2838 (EP,US);
H04M11/062 (EP,US);
H04N7/104 (EP,US);
H04N7/106 (EP,US);
H04N7/108 (EP,US);
H04N7/147 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1991/03] | H04N7/18 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1991/03] | Title | German: | Video-Übertragungs- und -Steuerungssystem unter Benutzung interner Telefonleitungen | [1991/03] | English: | Video transmission and control system utilizing internal telephone lines | [1991/03] | French: | Système de transmission et de commande utilisant des lignes téléphoniques internes | [1991/03] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1998/10: (deleted) | EPB 1998/10: (deleted) | EPB 1998/10: (deleted) | EPB 1997/28: Teilanmeldung 97201163.9 eingereicht am 21/04/97 | EPB 1997/28: Divisional application 97201163.9 filed on 21/04/97 | EPB 1997/28: Demande divisionnaire 97201163.9 déposée le 21/04/97 | Examination procedure | 02.10.1992 | Examination requested [1992/49] | 08.02.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.06.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.08.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.01.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.09.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.07.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 19.02.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1} | 25.04.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 09.09.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.11.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 27.11.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP97201163.9 / EP0798923 | Opposition(s) | 05.12.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/08] | Request for further processing for: | 21.04.1997 | Request for further processing filed | 21.04.1997 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.05.1997 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1994 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   27.12.1994 | 31.07.1995 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   27.12.1995 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2166322 ; | [AD]US4054910 (CHOU WAYNE W, et al); | [A]EP0062442 (NORTHERN TELECOM LTD [CA]); | [AD]US4509211 (ROBBINS MICHAEL S [US]) | [A] - GB-A-2 166 322, & GB2166322 A 00000000 | [A] - 15TH INTERNATIONAL TV SYMPOSIUM 17 June 1987, MONTREUX (CH) pages 165 - 173; J. HOFMANN: 'CABLE, TELEVISION, AND THE CONSUMER ELECTRONIC BUS' | Examination | GB2166322 |