EP0408283 - Apparatus for producing substrate sheet for optical recording mediums and process for producing substrate sheet for optical recording mediums making use of it, apparatus for producing optical recording medium and process for producing optical recording medium making use of it. [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1991/03] | Apparatus for producing substrate sheet for optical recording mediums and process for producing substrate sheet for optical recording mediums making use of it, and apparatus for producing optical recording medium and process for producing optical recording medium making use of it | ||
[1995/39] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.08.1996 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/03] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Okubo, Yukitoshi c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, 3-chome Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Santoh, Tsuyoshi c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, 3-chome Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Tamura, Miki c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, 3-chome Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Mihara, Chieko c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, 3-chome Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 05 /
Sugata, Hiroyuki c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, 3-chome Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 06 /
Kanome, Osamu c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, 3-chome Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 07 /
Yashima, Masataka c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, 3-chome Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1991/03] | Representative(s) | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford Crump LLP 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/03] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. 2-5 Warwick Court High Holborn London WC1R 5DJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 90307468.0 | 09.07.1990 | [1991/03] | Priority number, date | JP19890180831 | 12.07.1989 Original published format: JP 18083189 | JP19890243386 | 21.09.1989 Original published format: JP 24338689 | [1991/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0408283 | Date: | 16.01.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0408283 | Date: | 27.12.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0408283 | Date: | 27.09.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/26, B05C1/08, B32B31/00 | [1991/52] | CPC: |
B29C39/148 (EP,US);
B05C1/0808 (EP,US);
B05C1/12 (EP,US);
B29C43/222 (EP,US);
G11B7/26 (EP,US);
B29C59/04 (EP,US);
Y10S425/81 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1991/03] | G11B7/26 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1991/03] | Title | German: | Gerät zur Herstellung einer Substratschicht für optische Aufzeichnungsmedien, Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Substratschicht für optische Aufzeichnungsmedien, das Gebrauch davon macht, Gerät zur Herstellung eines optischen Aufzeichnungsmediums und Verfahren zur Herstellung eines optischen Aufzeichnungsmediums, das Gebrauch davon macht. | [1995/39] | English: | Apparatus for producing substrate sheet for optical recording mediums and process for producing substrate sheet for optical recording mediums making use of it, apparatus for producing optical recording medium and process for producing optical recording medium making use of it. | [1995/39] | French: | Appareil pour la fabrication d'un substrat pour des milieux d'enregistrement optique utilisant celui-ci, et appareil pour la fabrication d'un substrat pour les milieux d'enregistrement optique, appareil pour la fabrication d'un milieu d'enregistrement optique et procédé pour la fabrication d'un milieu d'enregistrement optique utilisant celui-ci. | [1995/39] |
Former [1991/03] | Gerät zur Herstellung einer Substratschicht für optische Aufzeichnungsmedien und Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Substratschicht für optische Aufzeichnungsmedien, das Gebrauch davon macht, und Gerät zur Herstellung eines optischen Aufzeichnungsmediums und Verfahren zur Herstellung eines optischen Aufzeichnungsmediums, das Gebrauch davon macht | ||
Former [1991/03] | Apparatus for producing substrate sheet for optical recording mediums and process for producing substrate sheet for optical recording mediums making use of it, and apparatus for producing optical recording medium and process for producing optical recording medium making use of it | ||
Former [1991/03] | Appareil pour la fabrication d'un substrat pour des milieux d'enregistrement optique et procédé pour la fabrication d'un substrat pour les milieux d'enregistrement optique utilisant celui-ci, et appareil pour la fabrication d'un milieu d'enregistrement optique et procédé pour la fabrication d'un milieu d'enregistrement optique utilisant celui-ci | Examination procedure | 31.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/10] | 11.11.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.05.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.10.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 14.02.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 20.02.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.04.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 28.04.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.06.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 27.09.1995 | DE | 28.12.1995 | [2006/14] |
Former [1996/30] | DE | 28.12.1995 | |
FR | 23.02.1996 | ||
Former [1996/28] | DE | 28.12.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP59071835 ; | [Y]JP62132619 ; | [Y]EP0288580 ; | [A]US4836874 (FOSTER MICHAEL S [US]) | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 8, no. 180 () 18 August 1984, & JP-A-59 071835 (SEKISUI KAGAKU KOGYO KK) 23 April 1984,, & JP59071835 A 19840423 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 11, no. 352 (M-643)(2799) 18 November 1987, & JP-A-62 132619 (SHOWA BUSSAN KK) 15 June 1987,, & JP62132619 A 19870615 |