EP0408322 - Dye-Borate complexes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.09.1994 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.09.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.11.1994 [1994/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Mead Corporation Mead World Headquarters Courthouse Plaza Northeast Dayton Ohio 45463 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/03] | For all designated states THE MEAD CORPORATION Mead World Headquarters Courthouse Plaza Northeast Dayton Ohio 45463 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shanklin, Michael Samuel 2541 Steeplechase 1A Miamisburg, Ohio 45342 / US | 02 /
Gottschalk, Peter 71 Gershwin Drive Centerville, Ohio 45459 / US | [1991/03] | Representative(s) | Deans, Michael John Percy, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/03] | Deans, Michael John Percy, et al Lloyd Wise, Tregear & CO. Norman House 105-109 Strand London WC2R OAE / GB | Application number, filing date | 90307555.4 | 10.07.1990 | [1991/03] | Priority number, date | US19890377671 | 10.07.1989 Original published format: US 377671 | [1991/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0408322 | Date: | 16.01.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0408322 | Date: | 24.11.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.10.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C09B69/02, C09B23/02, // G03C1/72 | [1991/03] | CPC: |
C09B69/06 (EP,US);
G03F7/28 (KR);
C09B23/02 (EP,US);
G03F7/002 (EP,US);
G03F7/029 (EP,US);
Y10S430/115 (EP,US);
Y10S430/116 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [1991/03] | Title | German: | Farbstoffboratkomplexe | [1991/03] | English: | Dye-Borate complexes | [1991/03] | French: | Complexes colorant-borate | [1991/03] | Examination procedure | 12.03.1991 | Examination requested [1991/19] | 29.03.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.05.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.08.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 25.08.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.08.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 24.11.1993 | LI | 24.11.1993 | [1994/31] | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4772541 (GOTTSCHALK PETER [US], et al); | [AD]US4772530 (GOTTSCHALK PETER [US], et al); | [A]GB2065694 (ACNA) |