EP0408349 - Mask for lithography [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 30.08.2002 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2002 | Refusal of application | published on 16.10.2002 [2002/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/03] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fukuda, Yasuaki c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 3-30-2, Shomomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Nose, Noriyuki c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 3-30-2, Shomomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1991/03] | Representative(s) | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford Crump LLP 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/03] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. 2-5 Warwick Court High Holborn London WC1R 5DJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 90307605.7 | 11.07.1990 | [1991/03] | Priority number, date | JP19890182022 | 13.07.1989 Original published format: JP 18202289 | [1991/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0408349 | Date: | 16.01.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0408349 | Date: | 10.07.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.05.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G03F1/14 | [1991/03] | CPC: |
G03F1/22 (EP);
G03F9/70 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1991/03] | Title | German: | Lithographiemaske | [1991/03] | English: | Mask for lithography | [1991/03] | French: | Masque pour la lithographie | [1991/03] | Examination procedure | 31.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/10] | 22.02.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.09.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.06.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.11.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.04.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.10.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.05.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.06.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.12.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.04.2002 | Date of oral proceedings | 17.05.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2002/42] | 17.05.2002 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 28.05.2002 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2002/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 18.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 23.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP59163825 ; | [X]JP60214531 ; | [Y]EP0195724 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]); | [X]US4152601 (IIDA YASUO [JP], et al); | [Y]EP0231916 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 9, no. 15 (E-291)(1738) 22 January 1985, & JP-A-59 163825 (NIPPON DENKI K.K.) 14 September 1984, & JP59163825 A 19840914 | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 97, 1982 Columbus, Ohio, USA FELDMAN M. et al: "Application of zone plates to alignment in X-ray lithography" page 641; column 2; ref. no. 101620K | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 10, (E-388) 14 March 1986, & JP-A-60 214531 (MATSUSHITA DENKI SANGYO) 26 October 1985, & JP60214531 A 19851026 | Examination | US4037969 | - SPIE, vol. 333, Submicron Lithography (1982), p. 124-130, M.Feldman et al.: "Application of zone plates to alignment in x-ray lithography" | - J. Vac. Sci. Technol. B1. vol. 4, Oct.-Dec. 1983, p. 1276-1279, H. Kinoshita et al.: "A dual grating alignment technique for x-ray lithography" |