EP0408370 - Stable tretinoin emulsified cream formulations [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.07.1996 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.11.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 14.01.2004 [2004/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bristol-Myers Squibb Company Route 206 and Province Line Road Princeton, NJ 08543 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/37] | For all designated states Bristol-Myers Squibb Company 345 Park Avenue New York, N.Y. 10154 / US | ||
Former [1991/03] | For all designated states Bristol-Myers Company 345 Park Avenue New York New York 10154 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Parab, Prakash 267 Patton Place Williamsville, New York 14221 / US | [1991/03] | Representative(s) | Jones, Alan John, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London, WC1A 2RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/03] | Jones, Alan John, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London, WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 90307656.0 | 12.07.1990 | [1991/03] | Priority number, date | US19890379294 | 13.07.1989 Original published format: US 379294 | US19890453640 | 20.12.1989 Original published format: US 453640 | [1991/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0408370 | Date: | 16.01.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0408370 | Date: | 13.03.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0408370 | Date: | 13.09.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.01.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/10, A61K31/07 | [1991/03] | CPC: |
A61K31/07 (EP,KR);
A61K47/10 (EP);
A61K8/342 (EP);
A61K8/671 (EP);
A61K9/0014 (EP);
A61K9/06 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/03] | Title | German: | Stabile emulgierte Tretinoin-Cremeformulierungen | [1991/03] | English: | Stable tretinoin emulsified cream formulations | [1991/03] | French: | Formulations de crème trétinoine émulsifiée stable | [1991/03] | Examination procedure | 19.08.1991 | Examination requested [1991/42] | 21.05.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.11.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.12.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.04.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.08.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.10.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.02.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.03.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 16.03.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.06.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.09.1995 | BE | 13.09.1995 | CH | 13.09.1995 | DK | 13.09.1995 | GR | 13.09.1995 | LI | 13.09.1995 | NL | 13.09.1995 | SE | 13.12.1995 | ES | 24.12.1995 | [2004/03] |
Former [2003/07] | AT | 13.09.1995 | |
BE | 13.09.1995 | ||
CH | 13.09.1995 | ||
DK | 13.09.1995 | ||
GR | 13.09.1995 | ||
LI | 13.09.1995 | ||
NL | 13.09.1995 | ||
SE | 13.12.1995 | ||
Former [2000/04] | AT | 13.09.1995 | |
BE | 13.09.1995 | ||
CH | 13.09.1995 | ||
DK | 13.09.1995 | ||
GR | 13.09.1995 | ||
LI | 13.09.1995 | ||
SE | 13.12.1995 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 13.09.1995 | |
BE | 13.09.1995 | ||
CH | 13.09.1995 | ||
DK | 13.09.1995 | ||
LI | 13.09.1995 | ||
SE | 13.12.1995 | ||
Former [1997/13] | AT | 13.09.1995 | |
BE | 13.09.1995 | ||
CH | 13.09.1995 | ||
LI | 13.09.1995 | ||
SE | 13.12.1995 | ||
Former [1996/28] | AT | 13.09.1995 | |
BE | 13.09.1995 | ||
SE | 13.12.1995 | ||
Former [1996/23] | BE | 13.09.1995 | |
SE | 13.12.1995 | ||
Former [1996/22] | BE | 13.09.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]GB906000 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE); | [XD]US3906108 (FELTY LANNY G); | [A]US3966967 (LEE KWAN-HUA); | [XD]GB1466062 (KNIGHT K); | [AD]US4727088 (SCOTT RICHARD A [US], et al); | [XP]EP0350438 (HERZOG PAUL [CH], et al) | Examination | - USAN and the USP Dictionary of Drug Names,p.613 |