EP0410628 - Belt-shaped member taking-out and transfer apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.12.1994 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.12.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.02.1995 [1995/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bridgestone Corporation 10-1, Kyobashi 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8340 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/05] | For all designated states Bridgestone Corporation 1-1, Kyobashi 1-Chome Chuo-Ku Tokyo 104 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kumagai, Yuzo 11-9, Sakae 5-chome, Niiza City Saitama Pref. / JP | [1991/05] | Representative(s) | Whalley, Kevin, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/05] | Whalley, Kevin, et al MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 90307828.5 | 17.07.1990 | [1991/05] | Priority number, date | JP19890192050 | 25.07.1989 Original published format: JP 19205089 | [1991/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0410628 | Date: | 30.01.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0410628 | Date: | 12.02.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.12.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B65G65/00, B66F7/08, B29D30/00 | [1992/07] | CPC: |
B29D30/0016 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1991/05] | B29D30/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1991/05] | Title | German: | Greif- und Übergabevorrichtung für bandförmige Teile | [1991/05] | English: | Belt-shaped member taking-out and transfer apparatus | [1991/05] | French: | Dispositif de saisie et de transfert d'éléments en forme de bandes | [1991/05] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 13.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/06] | 06.04.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.08.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/07] | 16.09.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1995/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1994 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2351033 (IMPIANTI TERMOELETTRICI IND [IT]); | [Y]DE3247899 (ROTZINGER AG [CH]); | [Y]FR2538364 (FRIGOFRANCE SA [FR]); | [Y]US3228659 (HORST-ERNST STURM); | [X]DE2222599 (EISENMANN KG MASCHB GES); | [X]GB774338 (MINES ET FONDERIES DE PONTGIBA); | [A]DE1166991 (TREPEL K G MASCHINENFABRIK) |