EP0412668 - Swing arm for a braiding machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.07.1992 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.09.1992 [1992/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HI-DRAW MACHINERY LIMITED PO Box 2, Dukes Mill Romsey Hampshire SO51 8XQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/07] | For all designated states HI-DRAW MACHINERY LIMITED PO Box 2, Dukes Mill Romsey Hampshire SO51 8XQ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hurst, Michael John 83 Midanbury Lane, Bitterne Park Southampton, Hampshire / GB | 02 /
Harrington, John Patrick Balmoral, 7 Romsey Road, Nursling Southampton, Hampshire / GB | [1991/07] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [1992/03] |
Former [1991/07] | Topps, Ronald R. Topps & Co. "Avilion" Noads Way Dibden Purlieu Southampton Hampshire SO4 5PB / GB | Application number, filing date | 90307836.8 | 18.07.1990 | [1991/07] | Priority number, date | GB19890018116 | 08.08.1989 Original published format: GB 8918116 | [1991/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0412668 | Date: | 13.02.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.1990 | Classification | IPC: | D04C3/42 | [1991/07] | CPC: |
D04C3/42 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1991/07] | Title | German: | Schwingarm für eine Flechtmaschine | [1991/07] | English: | Swing arm for a braiding machine | [1991/07] | French: | Bras oscillant pour un machine à tresser | [1991/07] | File destroyed: | 21.02.2000 | Examination procedure | 14.08.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/38] | 22.04.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1992/38] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Stay/Interruption | 26.05.1991 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: representative has died | 18.11.1991 | Resumption of proceedings | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US1386071 ; | [A]US1689389 (GUIDO HORN); | [A]US1105452 |