EP0409591 - Interface cable for connecting bedside electrocardiograph monitor to portable defibrillator/electrocardiograph machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.01.1992 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.01.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.03.1992 [1992/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Reyes, Rey S 26784 Via San Jose Mission Viejo California 92691 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/04] | For all designated states Reyes, Rey S 26784 Via San Jose Mission Viejo, California 92691 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1991/04] | Representative(s) | Sommerville, John Henry, et al Sommerville & Rushton, 45 Grosvenor Road St. Albans, Hertfordshire AL1 3AW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/04] | Sommerville, John Henry, et al SOMMERVILLE & RUSHTON 11 Holywell Hill St. Albans Hertfordshire, AL1 1EZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 90307850.9 | 18.07.1990 | [1991/04] | Priority number, date | US19890381456 | 18.07.1989 Original published format: US 381456 | [1991/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0409591 | Date: | 23.01.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.11.1990 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/0428, A61N1/38 | [1991/04] | CPC: |
A61N1/3904 (EP,US);
A61B5/303 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/04] | Title | German: | Verbindungskabel zum Anschluss eines am Krankenbett befindlichen EKG-Monitors an ein Defibrillationsgerät | [1991/04] | English: | Interface cable for connecting bedside electrocardiograph monitor to portable defibrillator/electrocardiograph machine | [1991/04] | French: | Câble destiné à la connection d'un moniteur électrocardiographique, disposé au lit d'un patient, à une unité de défibrillation | [1991/04] | File destroyed: | 15.03.1999 | Examination procedure | 24.07.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/13] | 25.10.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1992/13] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4094310 (MCEACHERN ROBERT A, et al); | [X]US3566876 (STOFT PAUL E, et al); | [X]WO8200414 (R2 CORP [US]); | [A]US3895635 (JUSTUS GEORGE JUNIOR, et al); | [A]US3812845 (PARTRIDGE L) |