EP0409629 - Ovary tissue transcriptional factors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.08.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.10.2003 [2003/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Calgene LLC 1920 Fifth Street Davis, CA 95616 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/37] | For all designated states Calgene LLC 1920 Fifth Street Davis, California 95616 / US | ||
Former [1991/04] | For all designated states CALGENE, INC. 1920 Fifth Street Suite F. Davis California 95616 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Martineau, Belinda 2120 Fortuna Court Davis, California 95616 / US | 02 /
Houck, Catherine M. 172 Carmel Court Vacaville, California 95688 / US | [1991/04] | Representative(s) | Paget, Hugh Charles Edward, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/06] | Paget, Hugh Charles Edward, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | ||
Former [1991/04] | Paget, Hugh Charles Edward MEWBURN ELLIS 2 Cursitor Street London EC4A 1BQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 90307926.7 | 19.07.1990 | [1991/04] | Priority number, date | US19890382518 | 19.07.1989 Original published format: US 382518 | [1991/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0409629 | Date: | 23.01.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0409629 | Date: | 16.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.11.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/29, C12N15/82, C12N5/10, A01H5/00 | [1991/04] | CPC: |
C12N15/8233 (EP);
C07K14/415 (EP);
C12N15/8218 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, LI [2002/40] |
Former [1991/04] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Fruchtknotentranskriptionsfaktoren | [1991/04] | English: | Ovary tissue transcriptional factors | [1991/04] | French: | Facteurs transcriptionnels du tissu ovarien | [1991/04] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Examination procedure | 09.04.1991 | Examination requested [1991/24] | 04.11.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.05.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.10.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.02.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.06.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.08.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.03.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1} | 14.05.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.08.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 05.08.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.07.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/41] | Request for further processing for: | 22.04.2002 | Request for further processing filed | 22.04.2002 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.05.2002 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 08.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 25.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 02.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1999 | 10   M06   Fee paid on   30.08.1999 | 31.07.2002 | 13   M06   Fee paid on   02.08.2002 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO8809334 (CALGENE INC [US]); | [XP]WO8912386 (CALGENE INC [US]) | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 110, 1989, page 122, abstract no. 19135j, Columbus, Ohio, US; G. AN et al.: "Organ-specific and developmental regulation of the nopaline synthase promoter in transgenic tobacco plants", & PLANT PHYSIOL. 1988, 88(3), 547-52 | [X] - SCIENCE, vol. 244, 14th April 1989, pages 174-181; P.N: BENFEY et al.: "Regulated genes in transgenic plants" | [YD] - THE PLANT CELL, vol. 1, January 1989, pages 15-24, American Society of Plant Physiologists; C.S. GASSER et al.: "Isolation of tissue-specific cDNAS from tomato pistils" | [Y] - BIOCHEMISTRY, vol. 20, 1981, pages 2256-2260, American Chemical Society; G.M. HASS et al.: "Amino acid sequence of a carboxypeptidase inhibitor from tomato fruit" | [XPO] - JOURNAL OF CELLULAR BIOCHEMISTRY, SUPPLEMENT 14E, 1990, UCLA SYMPOSIA ON MOLECULAR & CELLULAR BIOLOGY, ABSTRACTS, 19TH ANNUAL MEETINGS, MOLECULAR STRATEGIES FOR CROP IMPROVEMENT, 16th - 22nd April 1990, page 306, abstract no. R 236; B. MARTINEAU et al.: "Wound-inducible expression of a gene from tomato" | [A] - SCIENCE, vol. 240, 10th June 1988, pages 1460-1467; R.B. GOLDBERG: "Plants: Novel developmental processes" | [AO] - JOURNAL OF CELLULAR BIOCHEMISTRY, SUPPLEMENT 12C, 1988, UCLA SYMPOSIA ON MOLECULAR & CELLULAR BIOLOGY, ABSTRACTS 17TH ANNUAL MEETINGS, THE MOLECULAR BASIS OF PLANT DEVELOPMENT, 26th March - 2nd April 1988, page 137, abstract no. L 021; C.S. GASSER et al.: "Analysis of floral specific genes" |