EP0411844 - Process control for electrostatographic printers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.08.1997 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.10.1997 [1997/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Xerox Square - 020 Rochester New York 14644 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/06] | For all designated states XEROX CORPORATION Xerox Square - 020 Rochester New York 14644 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hayes, Thomas A. 33 Pleasant Street Clifton Springs, New York 14432 / US | [1991/06] | Representative(s) | Johnson, Reginald George, et al Rank Xerox Ltd Patent Department Parkway Marlow Buckinghamshire SL7 1YL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/41] | Johnson, Reginald George, et al Rank Xerox Ltd Patent Department Parkway Marlow Buckinghamshire SL7 1YL / GB | ||
Former [1991/06] | Hill, Cecilia Ann, et al Rank Xerox Ltd Patent Department Parkway Marlow Buckinghamshire SL7 1YL / GB | Application number, filing date | 90308288.1 | 27.07.1990 | [1991/06] | Priority number, date | US19890387259 | 31.07.1989 Original published format: US 387259 | [1991/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0411844 | Date: | 06.02.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0411844 | Date: | 04.03.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0411844 | Date: | 09.10.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.01.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/40, H04N1/29 | [1991/06] | CPC: |
H04N1/4078 (EP,US);
H04N1/4056 (EP,US);
H04N1/4076 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1991/06] | Title | German: | Prozesssteuerung für einen elektrostatographischen Drucker | [1991/06] | English: | Process control for electrostatographic printers | [1991/06] | French: | Commande de processus pour une imprimante électrostatographique | [1991/06] | Examination procedure | 04.09.1992 | Examination requested [1992/45] | 08.07.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.11.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.10.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 20.10.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.06.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 11.06.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.06.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Opposition(s) | 10.07.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/40] | Request for further processing for: | 20.10.1995 | Request for further processing filed | 10.10.1995 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.10.1995 | Decision despatched | 20.10.1995 | Request for further processing filed | 27.10.1995 | Decision despatched | 10.10.1995 | Request for further processing filed | 10.10.1995 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request deemed not to be filed | 27.10.1995 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2017431 (BOSCH ELEKTRONIK GMBH); | [A]US4467367 (OHARA YUJI [JP], et al); | [A]US4847695 (ARAI HITOSHI [JP]) |