EP0411923 - Polystyrene foam made with only carbon dioxide as a blowing agent and a process for making the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.11.1998 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.12.1998 [1998/53] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY 2030 Dow Center Midland, Michigan 48674 / US | [1997/48] |
Former [1991/06] | For all designated states THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY 2030 Dow Center, Abbott Road Midland, Michigan 48640 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Welsh, Gary C. 2120 Wheeler Road Midland, Michigan 48640 / US | [1991/06] | Representative(s) | Raynor, John, et al Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/06] | Raynor, John, et al W.H. Beck, Greener & Co 7 Stone Buildings Lincoln's Inn London WC2A 3SZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 90308467.1 | 01.08.1990 | [1991/06] | Priority number, date | US19890388468 | 02.08.1989 Original published format: US 388468 | [1991/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0411923 | Date: | 06.02.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0411923 | Date: | 23.10.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0411923 | Date: | 07.01.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.08.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C08J9/12, // C08L25:04 | [1991/06] | CPC: |
C08J9/122 (EP,US);
C08J9/00 (KR);
C08J2325/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1991/06] | Title | German: | Polystyrolschaumstoff, der nur mit CO2 als Treibmittel hergestellt wird und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung | [1991/06] | English: | Polystyrene foam made with only carbon dioxide as a blowing agent and a process for making the same | [1991/06] | French: | Mousse styrénique faite uniquement avec du CO2 comme agent gonflant et procédé de préparation | [1991/06] | Examination procedure | 10.04.1992 | Examination requested [1992/24] | 20.04.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.10.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.03.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.09.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 18.10.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.01.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 01.07.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 11.07.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.10.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 13.10.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.10.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/53] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS4970399 ; | [A]JPS5135595 ; | [A]AU529339B (MONSANTO CO); | [A]EP0318846 (BASF AG [DE]) | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1976, no. 10, Database accession no. 1976-17603X, & JPS4970399 A 19740708 (SEKISUI PLASTICS K.K.) | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1977, no. 46, Database accession no. 1977-81827Y, & JPS5135595 A 19760326 (ASAHI DOW K.K.) |