EP0414445 - Direct digital frequency synthesizer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.11.1995 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.11.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.01.1996 [1996/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE TITAN CORPORATION 3033 Science Park Road San Diego, California 92121-1002 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/49] | For all designated states THE TITAN CORPORATION 3033 Science Park Road San Diego, California 92121 / US | ||
Former [1991/09] | For all designated states TITAN LINKABIT CORPORATION 3033 Science Park Road San Diego California 92121 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bjerede, Bjorn Erik 603 Bonair Way La Jolla, California 92037 / US | [1991/09] | Representative(s) | Blatchford, William Michael, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/09] | Blatchford, William Michael, et al Withers & Rogers 4 Dyer's Buildings Holborn London EC1N 2JT / GB | Application number, filing date | 90308976.1 | 15.08.1990 | [1991/09] | Priority number, date | US19890398735 | 25.08.1989 Original published format: US 398735 | [1991/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0414445 | Date: | 27.02.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0414445 | Date: | 08.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0414445 | Date: | 25.01.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.02.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/02 | [1991/09] | CPC: |
G06F1/022 (EP,US);
G06F2211/902 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1991/09] | Title | German: | Direkter digitaler Frequenzsynthetisierer | [1991/09] | English: | Direct digital frequency synthesizer | [1991/09] | French: | Synthétiseur de fréquence numérique direct | [1991/09] | Examination procedure | 21.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/09] | 27.09.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.01.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.06.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.07.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.09.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 19.09.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.10.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4327419 (DEUTSCH RALPH, et al); | [A]US3946215 (MAY JACK L); | [A]US3838414 (WILES M); | [A]US4652832 (JASPER STEVEN C [US]) |