EP0413579 - Method and apparatus for emptying and transporting unstable objects such as ampoules [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.10.1994 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.10.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.11.1994 [1994/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eisai Co., Ltd. 6-10, Koishikawa 4-chome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo / JP | [1991/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ehara, Toshiyasu No. 346-16 Komoda, Misato-machi Kodama-gun, Saitama-ken / JP | 02 /
Kobayashi, Tohru No. 98-68 Jimbohara, Kamisato-machi Kodama-gun, Saitama-ken / JP | 03 /
Takada, Masao No. 771-4 Numawada Honjo-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | [1991/08] | Representative(s) | Rackham, Stephen Neil, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/08] | Rackham, Stephen Neil, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 90308992.8 | 16.08.1990 | [1991/08] | Priority number, date | JP19890212554 | 18.08.1989 Original published format: JP 21255489 | [1991/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0413579 | Date: | 20.02.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0413579 | Date: | 05.06.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0413579 | Date: | 01.12.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.04.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B65B69/00 | [1991/08] | CPC: |
B65B69/00 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1991/08] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Entleeren und Transportieren von unstabilen Gegenständen wie Ampullen | [1991/08] | English: | Method and apparatus for emptying and transporting unstable objects such as ampoules | [1991/08] | French: | Méthode et appareil de vidage et transport d'objets instables tels que des ampoules | [1993/48] |
Former [1991/08] | Méthode et appareil de vidage de transport d'objets instables tels que des ampoules | Examination procedure | 29.11.1991 | Examination requested [1992/04] | 21.07.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.11.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.06.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.08.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 20.08.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.09.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1840561 (BRE MILLER CLIFFORD E); | [A]US2704147 (COZZOLI FRANK J); | [A]FR1234195 ; | [A]US3022913 (VINCENT JOHN N, et al) |