EP0415602 - Indicia applying apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1991/10] | Indicia applying methods and apparatus | ||
[1993/45] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.09.1994 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 26.01.2000 [2000/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Philip Morris Products Inc. 3601 Commerce Road Richmond Virginia 23234 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/10] | For all designated states Philip Morris Products Inc. 3601 Commerce Road Richmond Virginia 23234 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
York, George 3270 Leprechaun Lane Palm Harbor, Florida 34682 / US | 02 /
Taylor, John Edward 3058 52nd Street North St. Petersburg, Florida 33710 / US | [1991/13] |
Former [1991/10] | 01 /
York, George 3270 Leprechaun Lane Palm Harbor, Florida 34682 / US | ||
02 /
Taylor, John Edward 4045 Indianapolis Northeast St. Petersburg, Florida 33703 / US | Representative(s) | Bass, John Henton, et al REDDIE & GROSE 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | [1993/45] |
Former [1993/28] | Brereton, Paul Arthur REDDIE & GROSE 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | ||
Former [1991/10] | Bass, John Henton REDDIE & GROSE 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 90309009.0 | 16.08.1990 | [1991/10] | Priority number, date | US19890401068 | 31.08.1989 Original published format: US 401068 | [1991/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0415602 | Date: | 06.03.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0415602 | Date: | 10.11.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.11.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B65C1/02, B65C9/18 | [1991/10] | CPC: |
B65C9/1873 (EP,US);
B65C1/021 (EP,US);
Y10T156/171 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/10] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Anbringen von Markierungen | [1993/45] | English: | Indicia applying apparatus | [1993/45] | French: | Appareil pour l'application de timbres | [1993/45] |
Former [1991/10] | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Anbringen von Markierungen | ||
Former [1991/10] | Indicia applying methods and apparatus | ||
Former [1991/10] | Procédé et appareil pour l'application de timbres | Examination procedure | 15.08.1991 | Examination requested [1991/41] | 27.02.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.06.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.07.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.08.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.01.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.02.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 01.04.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 20.04.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.07.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 20.07.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.08.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 10.11.1993 | [2000/04] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2516783 (MATTER ALBERT J); | [A]US4087312 (MALTESE PETER C); | [A]US4533586 (ROULE RICHARD L [US], et al); | [X]US4762587 (DEAL PHILIP A [US]) |