EP0415648 - Image processing apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.03.1999 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.03.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.05.1999 [1999/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/10] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kawai, Takashi, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Outa, Kenichi, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1991/10] | Representative(s) | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford Crump LLP 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/10] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. 2-5 Warwick Court High Holborn London WC1R 5DJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 90309238.5 | 23.08.1990 | [1991/10] | Priority number, date | JP19890225342 | 31.08.1989 Original published format: JP 22534289 | JP19890225352 | 31.08.1989 Original published format: JP 22535289 | [1991/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0415648 | Date: | 06.03.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0415648 | Date: | 08.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0415648 | Date: | 20.05.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.02.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G06T5/00, H04N1/40 | [1998/21] | CPC: |
H04N1/62 (EP,US);
H04N1/40062 (EP,US);
H04N1/4092 (EP,US);
H04N1/46 (EP,US);
H04N1/58 (EP,US);
H04N1/6072 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1991/33] | G06F15/66, H04N1/40 | ||
Former IPC [1991/10] | G06F15/66 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1991/10] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Bildverarbeitung | [1991/10] | English: | Image processing apparatus | [1991/10] | French: | Appareil de traitement d'images | [1991/10] | Examination procedure | 31.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/10] | 17.08.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.02.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.11.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.05.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.04.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 28.10.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 24.11.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.01.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 28.01.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.02.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP56149674 ; | [X]US4783840 (SONG WOO-JIN [US]); | [X]US4689666 (HATANAKA ISAMU [JP]); | [YD]US4194221 (STOFFEL JAMES C [US]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 6, no. 30, (P-103)(908), 23 February 1982, & JP - A - 56 149674 (TOSHIYUKI SAKAI) 19.11.1981, & JP56149674 A 19820223 | [A] - 9TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON PATTERN RECOGNITION, vol. 1, 14 November 1988, pages 125 - 133, Rome, IT, T. MATSUYAMA: 'Expert systems for image processing - knowledge-based composition of image analysis processes' | [A] - INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH AND SIGNAL PROCESSING, vol. 3, 23 May 1989, pages 1397 - 1400, Glasgow, GB, R.L. LAGENDIJK et al.: 'Blur identification using the expectation-maximization algorithm' |