EP0416800 - Knitting method for thick fabric of reduced elasticity [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1991/11] | Knitting method of thick fabric less in elasticity | ||
[1995/19] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.03.1996 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.05.1996 [1996/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shima Seiki Manufacturing., Ltd. No. 85, Sakata Wakayama-shi Wakayama 641 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/11] | For all designated states SHIMA SEIKI MFG., Ltd. No. 85, Sakata Wakayama-shi, Wakayama 641 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Okuno, Masao 2-4-5, Higashi-takamatsu, Wakayama-shi Wakayama-ken / JP | [1991/11] | Representative(s) | Hillier, Peter, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/11] | Hillier, Peter, et al Reginald W. Barker & Co., Chancery House, 53-64, Chancery Lane London, WC2A 1QU / GB | Application number, filing date | 90309419.1 | 29.08.1990 | [1991/11] | Priority number, date | JP19890234424 | 08.09.1989 Original published format: JP 23442489 | [1991/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0416800 | Date: | 13.03.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0416800 | Date: | 10.06.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0416800 | Date: | 10.05.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.04.1992 | Classification | IPC: | D04B1/10, D04B7/02, D04B7/20 | [1992/25] | CPC: |
D04B1/102 (EP,US);
D04B1/00 (KR);
D10B2401/062 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1991/11] | D04B1/10, D04B7/04, D04B7/20 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1991/11] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Stricken eines dicken Gewebes geringer Elastizität | [1991/11] | English: | Knitting method for thick fabric of reduced elasticity | [1995/19] | French: | Procédé de tricotage trame pour la production de tricots épaisses à élasticité basse | [1991/11] |
Former [1991/11] | Knitting method of thick fabric less in elasticity | Examination procedure | 22.10.1992 | Examination requested [1992/52] | 06.05.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.08.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.10.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 21.10.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.10.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Opposition(s) | 13.02.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2144271 ; | [A]US4083203 (THEYS ANDRE P); | [A]DE2827317 (DUBIED & CIE SA E); | [A]DE3214280 (TEXTIMA VEB K [DD]) |