EP0419064 - Computer system having apparatus for providing pointing device independent support in an operating environment [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.07.1996 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.1996 | Withdrawal of application | published on 21.08.1996 [1996/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/13] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lathrop, Frederick Lind 5 South West Dolphic Drive Delray Beach, Florida 33445 / US | 02 /
Rowland, Kenneth Alan 1006 South West 28th Avenue Boynton Beach, Florida 33426 / US | [1991/13] | Representative(s) | Burt, Roger James IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/13] | Burt, Roger James, Dr. IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | Application number, filing date | 90309463.9 | 30.08.1990 | [1991/13] | Priority number, date | US19890411074 | 22.09.1989 Original published format: US 411074 | [1991/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0419064 | Date: | 27.03.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0419064 | Date: | 05.08.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.06.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G06F13/10, G06F3/033 | [1992/32] | CPC: |
G06F3/038 (EP,US);
G06F13/102 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1991/13] | G06F13/10 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1991/13] | Title | German: | Rechnersystem mit Vorrichtung zur Verfügungsstellung von anordnungsunabhängigen Unterstützungsmitteln für Hinweisanordnungen in einer Betriebsumgebung | [1991/13] | English: | Computer system having apparatus for providing pointing device independent support in an operating environment | [1991/13] | French: | Système calculateur avec appareil pour fournir des moyens d'assistance à des dispositifs de pointage, indépendemment du dispositif, dans un environnement opérationnel | [1991/13] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 13.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/13] | 09.11.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.02.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.06.1996 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1996/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - RAY DUNCAN 'Advanced OS/2 Programming' 1989 , MICROSOFT PRESS , REDMOND, WASHINGTON, USA Section two, Chapter five: 'Keyboard and mouse input', page 91 - page 92; | [A] - ELECTRONIC DESIGN. vol. 31, no. 2, 20 January 1983, HASBROUCK HEIGHTS, NEW JERSEY pages 167 - 173; B. PERRY: 'Graphics frees itself from device-dependence' |