EP0415754 - An image forming apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.10.1997 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.11.1997 [1997/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/10] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hasegawa, Takashi, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 3-30-2 Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Gu, Sono, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 3-30-2 Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [1991/10] | Representative(s) | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford Crump LLP 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/10] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. 2-5 Warwick Court High Holborn London WC1R 5DJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 90309488.6 | 30.08.1990 | [1991/10] | Priority number, date | JP19890225353 | 31.08.1989 Original published format: JP 22535389 | JP19890225370 | 31.08.1989 Original published format: JP 22537089 | [1991/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0415754 | Date: | 06.03.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0415754 | Date: | 27.11.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.01.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G03G15/04, H04N1/407 | [1996/48] | CPC: |
G06K15/129 (EP,US);
G06K15/12 (EP,US);
H04N1/295 (EP,US);
H04N1/4072 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1991/10] | G06K15/12, G03G15/052, H04N1/40 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1991/10] | Title | German: | Ein Abbildungsgerät | [1991/10] | English: | An image forming apparatus | [1991/10] | French: | Un appareil de formation d'images | [1991/10] | Examination procedure | 31.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/10] | 14.04.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.10.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.06.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 01.09.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.01.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 15.05.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 29.05.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.08.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 01.08.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.08.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/47] | Request for further processing for: | 01.09.1995 | Request for further processing filed | 01.09.1995 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.09.1995 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0276107 (CANON KK [JP]); | [XP]US4876556 (OHARA YUJI [JP]); | [X]EP0269033 (DU PONT [US]) |