EP0455905 - Dipsticks for nucleic acid hybridization assays and methods for covalently immobilizing oligonucleotides [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1991/46] | Solid supports for nucleic acid hybridization assays and methods for covalently immobilizing oligonucleotides | ||
[1998/25] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.04.1999 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.04.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.06.1999 [1999/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MICROPROBE CORPORATION 1725-220th Street S.E. Suite 104 Bothell, WA 98021 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/46] | For all designated states MICROPROBE CORPORATION 1725-220th Street S.E. Suite 104 Bothell, WA 98021 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Van Ness, Jeffrey 10701-189th Street N.E. Bothell, Washington 98011 / US | 02 /
Tabone, John C. 12117 N.E. 166th Place Bothell, Washington 98011 / US | 03 /
Petrie, Charles E. 18459 N.E. 166th Place Woodinville, Washington 98072 / US | 04 /
Vermeulen, Nicolaas M.J. 19334-196th Avenue, N.E. Woodinville, Washington 98072 / US | [1991/46] | Representative(s) | Thomson, Paul Anthony, et al Potts, Kerr & Co. 15, Hamilton Square Birkenhead Merseyside CH41 6BR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/46] | Thomson, Paul Anthony, et al Potts, Kerr & Co. 15, Hamilton Square Birkenhead Merseyside L41 6BR / GB | Application number, filing date | 90309671.7 | 04.09.1990 | [1991/46] | Priority number, date | US19900522442 | 11.05.1990 Original published format: US 522442 | [1991/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0455905 | Date: | 13.11.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0455905 | Date: | 07.10.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0455905 | Date: | 17.06.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.08.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68 | [1991/46] | CPC: |
C07H21/00 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6834 (EP,US);
C12Q1/689 (EP,US);
G01N33/54313 (EP,US);
G01N33/582 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/46] | Title | German: | Teststreifen zum Eintauchen für Nukleinsäure-Hybridisierungsassays und Verfahren zur kovalenten Immobilisierung von Oligonucleotiden | [1998/25] | English: | Dipsticks for nucleic acid hybridization assays and methods for covalently immobilizing oligonucleotides | [1998/25] | French: | Bâtonnets d'immersion pour l'essai d'hybridition des acides nucléiques et procédés pour l'immobilisation covalente d'oligonucléotides | [1998/25] |
Former [1991/46] | Träger für Nukleinsäure-Hybridisierungsassays und Verfahren zur kovalenten Immobilisierung von Oligonucleotiden | ||
Former [1991/46] | Solid supports for nucleic acid hybridization assays and methods for covalently immobilizing oligonucleotides | ||
Former [1991/46] | Supports solides pour l'essai d'hybridition des acides nucléiques et procédés pour l'immobilisation covalente d'oligonucléotides | Miscellaneous | EPB 1996/43: Teilanmeldung 96113623.1 eingereicht am 26/08/96 | EPB 1996/43: Divisional application 96113623.1 filed on 26/08/96 | EPB 1996/43: Demande divisionnaire 96113623.1 déposée le 26/08/96 | Examination procedure | 18.01.1993 | Examination requested [1993/11] | 20.04.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.08.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.12.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.07.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.12.1995 | Date of oral proceedings | 22.02.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.02.1996 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 30.08.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.04.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.11.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.02.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 12.02.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP96113623.1 / EP0745689 | Opposition(s) | 18.03.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1994 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   31.10.1994 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DD238395 (AKAD WISSENSCHAFTEN DDR [DD]); | [X]EP0221308 (MILES LAB [US]); | [A]GB2197720 (NAT RES DEV) | [XD] - NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH vol. 15, no. 7, 1987, pages 2891-2909, Arlington, VA, US; J.N. KREMSKY et al.: "Immobilization of DNA via oligonucleotides containing an aldehyde or carboxylic acid group at the 5' terminus" | [AD] - ANALYTICAL BIOCHEMISTRY vol. 89, no. 2, September 1978, pages 616-619, New York, US; S. BIAGIONI et al.: "A new method for the preparation of DNA-cellulose" | [AD] - NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH vol. 15, no. 7, 1987, pages 3131-3139, Arlington, VA, US; B.A. CONNOLLY: "The synthesis of oligonucleotides containing a primary amino group at the 5'-terminus" | [T] - NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH vol. 19, no. 12, 25 June 1991, pages 3345-3350, Eynsham, Oxford, GB; J. VAN NESS et al.: "A versatile solid support system for oligodeoxynucleotide probe-based hybridization assays" |