EP0416891 - Apparatus for providing a universal interface to a process control system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.05.1999 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HONEYWELL INC. Honeywell Plaza Minneapolis, MN 55408 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/11] | For all designated states HONEYWELL INC. Honeywell Plaza Minneapolis Minnesota 55408 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bansal, Ravinder M. 27 Barrel Stave Circle, Horsham Montgomery Co PA 19044 / US | 02 /
Hahn, Amand J. 1555 Morris Road, Lansdale Montgomery Co PA 19446 / US | [1991/11] | Representative(s) | Fox-Male, Nicholas Vincent Humbert, et al Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Fox-Male, Nicholas Vincent Humbert, et al Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | ||
Former [1998/52] | Fox-Male, Nicholas Vincent Humbert, et al Eric Potter Clarkson Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | ||
Former [1991/11] | Fox-Male, Nicholas Vincent Humbert, et al Honeywell Control Systems Limited, Honeywell House, Arlington Business Park Bracknell, Berkshire RG12 1EB / GB | Application number, filing date | 90309706.1 | 05.09.1990 | [1991/11] | Priority number, date | US19890402954 | 05.09.1989 Original published format: US 402954 | [1991/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0416891 | Date: | 13.03.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0416891 | Date: | 24.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0416891 | Date: | 22.07.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G06F13/38, G06F13/12, G06F19/00 | [1998/30] | CPC: |
G06F13/385 (EP);
G05B19/0421 (EP);
G05B2219/25314 (EP);
G05B2219/25428 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1993/12] | G06F13/38, G06F13/12, G06F15/46 | ||
Former IPC [1991/11] | G06F13/38, G06F13/18, G06F15/46 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1991/11] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Bereitstellung einer universellen Schnittstelle für ein Prozesssteuerungssystem | [1991/11] | English: | Apparatus for providing a universal interface to a process control system | [1991/11] | French: | Appareil pour fournir une interface universelle à un système de contrôle d'un procédé | [1991/11] | Examination procedure | 02.08.1993 | Examination requested [1993/39] | 14.07.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.07.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.08.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.01.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.01.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.02.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 12.02.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.04.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 22.07.1998 | IT | 22.07.1998 | NL | 22.07.1998 | [2008/01] |
Former [2003/07] | BE | 22.07.1998 | |
NL | 22.07.1998 | ||
Former [1999/27] | BE | 22.07.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4253148 (JOHNSON WILLIAM D, et al); | [XD]US4296464 (WOODS RODNEY G, et al); | [Y]EP0147046 (TANDEM COMPUTERS INC [US]) | [X] - IEEE 1980 IECI PROCEEDINGS 1980, PHILADELPHIA,US pages 340 - 344 J.R.GLOVER JR. ET AL. 'A Design for the Remote Link Unit - a Multiprocessor Remote Terminal' |