EP0420439 - Method of and apparatus for determining the position of a transducer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.06.1998 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY INTERNATIONAL P.O. Box 309 Georgetown Grand Cayman Island / KY | [N/P] |
Former [1991/14] | For all designated states SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY INTERNATIONAL c/o Maples & Calder, P.O. Box 309 Georgetown, Grand Cayman Island / KY | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Weispfenning, Gerald Lee 3540, 11th Avenue South, Apartment 3 Minneapolis, Minnesota 55407 / US | 02 /
Goss, Lloyd Chambers 9501 Woodbridge Road Bloomington, Minnesota 55438 / US | [1991/14] | Representative(s) | Kenyon, Sarah Elizabeth, et al Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/41] | Kenyon, Sarah Elizabeth, et al Orchard Kenyon & Co. Staple Inn Buildings North High Holborn London WC1V 7PZ / GB | ||
Former [1995/13] | Sturt, Clifford Mark, et al J. MILLER & CO. 34 Bedford Row Holborn London WC1R 4JH / GB | ||
Former [1993/26] | Miller, Joseph J. MILLER & CO. 34 Bedford Row, Holborn London WC1R 4JH / GB | ||
Former [1991/14] | Caro, William Egerton J. MILLER & CO. Lincoln House 296-302 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | Application number, filing date | 90309907.5 | 11.09.1990 | [1991/14] | Priority number, date | US19890415500 | 29.09.1989 Original published format: US 415500 | [1991/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0420439 | Date: | 03.04.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0420439 | Date: | 13.08.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G11B5/596 | [1991/14] | CPC: |
G11B5/5556 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1991/14] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Gerät zum Erfassen der Transduktorlage | [1991/14] | English: | Method of and apparatus for determining the position of a transducer | [1991/14] | French: | Méthode et appareil pour déterminer la position d'un transducteur | [1991/14] | Examination procedure | 02.07.1991 | Examination requested [1991/35] | 14.01.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.07.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.03.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.07.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.06.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.11.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.01.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 17.01.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.05.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 13.08.1997 | IT | 13.08.1997 | NL | 13.08.1997 | [2004/35] |
Former [2003/07] | IT | 13.08.1997 | |
NL | 13.08.1997 | ||
FR | 09.01.1998 | ||
Former [1999/42] | IT | 13.08.1997 | |
FR | 09.01.1998 | ||
Former [1998/35] | FR | 09.01.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR2309948 (BURROUGHS CORP [US]); | [A]EP0094314 (DIGITAL EQUIPMENT CORP [US]); | [Y]US4590526 (LAATT RICHARD G [US], et al) | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN. vol. 25, no. 6, November 1982, NEW YORK US pages 2910 - 2914; case et al: "hybrid position error signal generation for disk file" |