EP0420459 - Oral pharmaceutical composition for acid sensitive proteinaceous agents [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.08.1992 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.10.1992 [1992/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WARNER-LAMBERT COMPANY 201 Tabor Road Morris Plains New Jersey 07950 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/14] | For all designated states WARNER-LAMBERT COMPANY 201 Tabor Road Morris Plains New Jersey 07950 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Huang, Hua-Pin 24 Horizon Drive Succasunna, New Jersey 07876 / US | 02 /
Ghebre-Sellassie, Isaac 359 Dell Place Stanhope, New Jersey 07874 / US | 03 /
Fawzi, Mahdi B. 11 Timberline Drive Flanders, New Jersey 07836 / US | [1991/14] | Representative(s) | Jones, Michael Raymond, et al Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/14] | Jones, Michael Raymond, et al HASELTINE LAKE & CO. Hazlitt House 28 Southampton Buildings Chancery Lane London WC2A 1AT / GB | Application number, filing date | 90310065.9 | 14.09.1990 | [1991/14] | Priority number, date | US19890413197 | 27.09.1989 Original published format: US 413197 | [1991/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0420459 | Date: | 03.04.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0420459 | Date: | 07.08.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.06.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/48, A61K9/32, A61K39/145 | [1991/32] | CPC: |
A61K9/4891 (EP,US);
A61K9/4858 (EP,US);
A61K9/4866 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1991/14] | A61K9/48, A61K9/32 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/14] | Title | German: | Orale Arzneimittel mit säurelabilen Proteinwirkstoffen | [1991/14] | English: | Oral pharmaceutical composition for acid sensitive proteinaceous agents | [1991/14] | French: | Composition pharmaceutique orale pour des substances protéiniques sensibles aux acides | [1991/14] | File destroyed: | 17.02.2000 | Examination procedure | 08.02.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/41] | 13.05.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1992/41] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1330034 (MO NII VIRUSNYKH PREPARATOV); | [Y]EP0156242 (CHEMO SERO THERAPEUT RES INST [JP]); | [Y]EP0192321 (BEECHAM GROUP PLC [GB]) |