EP0420471 - Electrical connectors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 08.06.1995 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.06.1995 | Withdrawal of application | published on 26.07.1995 [1995/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INTERNATIONAL CONTROL AUTOMATION FINANCE S.A. 16 Rue des Bains Ville de Luxembourg / LU | [1991/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bastijanic, Edward 7064 Bristlewood Drive Concord, Ohio 44077 / US | 02 /
McGlinchy, Timothy B. 1430 Rockefeller/Upstairs Wickliffe, Ohio 44092 / US | 03 /
Thomas, Gary Shiels 557 East Overlook Drive Eastlake, Ohio 44095 / US | 04 /
Wroblewski, David Joseph 7610 King Memorial Mentor, Ohio 44060 / US | [1991/14] | Representative(s) | Cotter, Ivan John, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/14] | Cotter, Ivan John, et al D. YOUNG & CO. 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 90310173.1 | 18.09.1990 | [1991/14] | Priority number, date | US19890413513 | 27.09.1989 Original published format: US 413513 | [1991/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0420471 | Date: | 03.04.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0420471 | Date: | 01.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.02.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H01R23/68, H02H9/00 | [1992/14] | CPC: |
H01R12/52 (EP,US);
H01R12/70 (KR)
|
Former IPC [1991/14] | H01R23/68 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1991/14] | Title | German: | Elektrische Verbinder | [1991/14] | English: | Electrical connectors | [1991/14] | French: | Connecteurs électriques | [1991/14] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 30.07.1992 | Examination requested [1992/39] | 09.02.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.06.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.12.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.01.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 30.01.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.05.1995 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1995/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4346419 (JANNIELLO FRANK); | [A]EP0105083 (SIEMENS AG); | [A]US4565416 (RUDY WILLIAM J [US], et al); | [X]FR2615669 (CIT ALCATEL [FR]); | [XP]DE8903649U |