EP0419240 - Exposure apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.02.1996 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.04.1996 [1996/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/13] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nose, Noriyuki c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 3-30-2 Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Ebinuma, Ryuichi c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 3-30-2 Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Ozawa, Kunitaka c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 3-30-2 Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Kariya, Takao c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 3-30-2 Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 05 /
Uzawa, Shunichi c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 3-30-2 Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1991/13] | Representative(s) | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford Crump LLP 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/13] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. 2-5 Warwick Court High Holborn London WC1R 5DJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 90310267.1 | 19.09.1990 | [1991/13] | Priority number, date | JP19890243290 | 21.09.1989 Original published format: JP 24329089 | [1991/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0419240 | Date: | 27.03.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0419240 | Date: | 02.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0419240 | Date: | 12.04.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.11.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/20 | [1991/13] | CPC: |
G03F7/70066 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1991/13] | Title | German: | Belichtungsvorrichtung | [1991/13] | English: | Exposure apparatus | [1991/13] | French: | Appareil d'exposition | [1991/13] | Examination procedure | 31.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/13] | 10.05.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.11.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.05.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 04.10.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 11.10.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.12.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 16.12.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.01.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/14] | Request for further processing for: | 24.11.1993 | Request for further processing filed | 24.11.1993 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.12.1993 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP61131445 ; | [YP]EP0358521 (CANON KK [JP]); | [Y]EP0136672 (HITACHI LTD [JP]); | [A]EP0326540 (THALLNER ERICH) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 10, no. 319 (E-450)(2375) 30 October 1986 & JP-A-61 131 445 ( CANON INC ) 19 June 1986, & JP61131445 A 19860619 |