EP0420528 - Dynamic transport facility identification [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1991/14] | Dynamic circuit identifier | ||
[1996/03] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.11.1996 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.11.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.01.1997 [1997/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AT&T Corp. 32 Avenue of the Americas New York, NY 10013-2412 / US | [1991/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Krantz, Louis 1 D26 Chester, New Jersey 07930 / US | [1991/14] | Representative(s) | Buckley, Christopher Simon Thirsk, et al Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex IG8 0TU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/14] | Buckley, Christopher Simon Thirsk, et al AT&T (UK) LTD., AT&T Intellectual Property Division, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green, Essex IG8 0TU / GB | Application number, filing date | 90310381.0 | 21.09.1990 | [1991/14] | Priority number, date | US19890414875 | 29.09.1989 Original published format: US 414875 | [1991/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0420528 | Date: | 03.04.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0420528 | Date: | 13.01.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0420528 | Date: | 17.01.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q11/04, H04M3/24, H04M11/06, H04M3/54 | [1993/02] | CPC: |
H04M3/54 (EP,US);
H04M3/42 (KR);
H04M3/245 (EP,US);
H04Q11/0428 (EP,US);
H04Q11/045 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1991/14] | H04M3/24, H04Q11/04, H04M11/06, H04M3/54 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1991/14] | Title | German: | Dynamischer Übertragungsmedienidentifizierer | [1996/03] | English: | Dynamic transport facility identification | [1996/03] | French: | Identification dynamique de facilité de transfert | [1996/03] |
Former [1991/14] | Dynamischer Schaltungsidentifizierer | ||
Former [1991/14] | Dynamic circuit identifier | ||
Former [1991/14] | Dispositif d'identification dynamique de circuit | Examination procedure | 01.07.1993 | Examination requested [1993/35] | 20.07.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.10.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.11.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.01.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.06.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.07.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.09.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 22.09.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.10.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP57206159 ; | [X]JP63037755 ; | [E]US4959856 (BISCHOFF RAYMOND B [US], et al); | [E]EP0430534 (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]) | [Y] - INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON SUBSCRIBER LOOPS AND SERVICES ISSLS '86. 29 September 1986, TOKYO JP pages 271 - 276 H.T. STUMP | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 007, no. 058 (E-163)10 March 1983 & JP-A-57 206 159 ( NIPPON DENSHIN DENWA KOSHA ) 17 December 1982, & JP57206159 A 19821217 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 012, no. 250 (E-633)14 July 1988 & JP-A-63 037 755 ( HITACHI ) 18 February 1988, & JP63037755 A 19880218 | [A] - BOSTONIC/89, SESSION 11, PAPER 4. vol. 1, 11 June 1989, BOSTON US pages 1 - 6 W.T.GUTHRIE ET AL. | [A] - PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL COMMUNICATIONS FORUM vol. 42, no. 2, 30 September 1988, OAK BROOK, ILLINOIS US pages 1127 - 1132 W.A. VANDEWALL ET AL. | [A] - 39TH IEEE VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE vol. 2, 1 May 1989, SAN FRANCISCO US pages 729 - 734 S.SUZUKI ET AL. | Examination | - ISDN; P. Bocker; Springer-Verlag, Berlin, DE; pages 86-87 |