EP0420584 - PLL demodulating circuit in traffic information receiver [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition procedure closed Status updated on 30.01.1998 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORPORATION No.41, Meguro 1-chome Meguro-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/14] | For all designated states PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORPORATION No.41, Meguro 1-chome Meguro-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kasa, Koichi, c/o Pioneer Electronic Corporation Kawagoe Works, No. 25-1, Aza Nishi-machi Ohaza Yamada, Kawagoe-shi, Saitama / JP | 02 /
Ichikawa, Toshihito, c/o Pioneer Electronic Co. Kawagoe Works, No. 25-1, Aza Nishi-machi Ohaza Yamada, Kawagoe-shi, Saitama / JP | [1991/14] | Representative(s) | Sturt, Clifford Mark, et al MARKS & CLERK 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/14] | Sturt, Clifford Mark, et al MARKS & CLERK 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 90310493.3 | 25.09.1990 | [1991/14] | Priority number, date | JP19890251135 | 27.09.1989 Original published format: JP 25113589 | [1991/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0420584 | Date: | 03.04.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0420584 | Date: | 05.08.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0420584 | Date: | 22.11.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.06.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G08G1/09 | [1991/14] | CPC: |
H04H20/55 (EP);
G08G1/091 (EP);
H04H20/34 (EP);
H04H40/27 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1991/14] | Title | German: | PLL-Demodulationsschaltung in einem Verkehrsnachrichtenempfänger | [1991/14] | English: | PLL demodulating circuit in traffic information receiver | [1991/14] | French: | Circuit PLL démodulateur dans un récepteur d'informations de trafic | [1991/14] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 15.10.1992 | Examination requested [1992/52] | 31.03.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.05.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.08.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 21.08.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
19.08.1996
ADMISSIBLE Robert Bosch GmbH Zentralabteilung Patente Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/42] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
19.08.1996
ADMISSIBLE Robert Bosch GmbH Zentralabteilung Patente Postfach 30 02 20 D-70442 Stuttgart / DE | 02.10.1996 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 21.10.1996 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 22.10.1997 | Despatch of communication that the opposition procedure will be closed | 09.11.1997 | Legal effect of closure of opposition procedure [1998/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 22.11.1995 | DE | 23.02.1996 | GB | 25.09.1996 | [2006/14] |
Former [1997/42] | DE | 23.02.1996 | |
FR | 19.04.1996 | ||
GB | 25.09.1996 | ||
Former [1996/37] | DE | 23.02.1996 | |
FR | 19.04.1996 | ||
Former [1996/28] | DE | 23.02.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE3733096 ; | [A]US3949401 ; | [A]US4024475 |