EP0420595 - Deposited film formation method utilizing selective deposition by use of alkyl aluminum hydride [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.03.1997 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR, LU | published on 09.02.2000 [2000/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/14] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mikoshiba, Nobuo 30-18, Yagiyamahon-cho 2-chome, Taihaku-ku Sendai-shi, Miyagi-ken / JP | 02 /
Tsubouchi, Kazuo 30-38, Hitokita 2-chome, Taihaku-ku Sendai-shi, Miyagi-ken / JP | 03 /
Masu, Kazuya 3-1-106, Mikamine 1-chome, Taihaku-ku Sendai-shi, Miyagi-ken / JP | [1991/14] | Representative(s) | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford Crump LLP 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/14] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. 2-5 Warwick Court High Holborn London WC1R 5DJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 90310506.2 | 25.09.1990 | [1991/14] | Priority number, date | JP19890250021 | 26.09.1989 Original published format: JP 25002189 | JP19900036198 | 19.02.1990 Original published format: JP 3619890 | [1991/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0420595 | Date: | 03.04.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0420595 | Date: | 11.09.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0420595 | Date: | 01.05.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.07.1991 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/285, H01L21/3205, H01L21/768 | [1996/18] | CPC: |
H01L21/32051 (EP,US);
H01L21/283 (KR);
H01L21/28562 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0002 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1991/44] | H01L21/285, H01L21/3205, H01L21/90 | ||
Former IPC [1991/14] | H01L21/285, H01L21/3205 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/14] | Title | German: | Herstellen von einer selektiv niedergeschlagenen Schicht mit Anwendung von Alkylaluminiumhydrid | [1991/26] | English: | Deposited film formation method utilizing selective deposition by use of alkyl aluminum hydride | [1991/14] | French: | Formation d'un film déposé sélectivement utilisant de l'hydrure d'alkyl-aluminium double de métal | [1991/26] |
Former [1991/14] | Herstellen von einer selektiv niedergeschlagenen Schicht mit Anwendung von Alkalimetallaluminiumhydrid | ||
Former [1991/14] | Formation d'un film déposé sélectivement utilisant de l'hydrure double de métal alcalin et d'aluminium | Examination procedure | 31.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/14] | 07.05.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.11.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.04.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.11.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 16.12.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.04.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.08.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.11.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 02.11.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.02.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/17] | Request for further processing for: | 16.12.1994 | Request for further processing filed | 16.12.1994 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.01.1995 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.05.1996 | BE | 01.05.1996 | CH | 01.05.1996 | DK | 01.05.1996 | GR | 01.05.1996 | LI | 01.05.1996 | SE | 01.08.1996 | LU | 30.09.1996 | [2000/04] |
Former [1998/15] | AT | 01.05.1996 | |
BE | 01.05.1996 | ||
CH | 01.05.1996 | ||
DK | 01.05.1996 | ||
LI | 01.05.1996 | ||
SE | 01.08.1996 | ||
Former [1997/21] | AT | 01.05.1996 | |
BE | 01.05.1996 | ||
CH | 01.05.1996 | ||
LI | 01.05.1996 | ||
SE | 01.08.1996 | ||
Former [1997/13] | AT | 01.05.1996 | |
CH | 01.05.1996 | ||
LI | 01.05.1996 | ||
SE | 01.08.1996 | ||
Former [1997/03] | AT | 01.05.1996 | |
SE | 01.08.1996 | ||
Former [1996/51] | SE | 01.08.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - THIN SOLID FILMS. vol. 45, 1977, LAUSANNE CH pages 257 - 263; H.O. PIERSON: "ALUMINIUM COATINGS BY THE DECOMPOSITION OF ALKYLS" | [A] - JAPANESE JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS. vol. 27, no. 8, August 1988, TOKYO JP pages 1392 - 1394; M. HANABUSHA ET.AL.: "PHOTOCHEMICAL VAPOUR DEPOSITION OF ALUMINIUM THIN FILMS USING DIMETHYLALUMINIUM HYDRIDE" |