EP0420625 - Safety device for crane [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.05.1996 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.07.1996 [1996/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA KOBE SEIKO SHO 3-18 Wakinohama-cho 1-chome Chuo-ku Kobe 651 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/14] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA KOBE SEIKO SHO 3-18 Wakinohama-cho 1-chome Chuo-ku Kobe 651 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yoshimatsu, Hideaki 7-19-6, Takaoka, Okubu-cho Akashi-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | 02 /
Hayashi, Norihiko 467-1, Ishimori, Kanno-cho Kakogawa-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | 03 /
Kinugawa, Hideki 1251-2, Anase, Shikama-ku Himeji-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | [1991/14] | Representative(s) | Blake, John Henry Francis, et al Brookes Batchellor 1 Boyne Park Tunbridge Wells Kent TN4 8EL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/21] | Blake, John Henry Francis, et al BROOKES AND MARTIN High Holborn House 52/54 High Holborn London WC1V 6SE / GB | ||
Former [1991/14] | Wright, Hugh Ronald Brookes & Martin 52/54 High Holborn London WC1V 6SE / GB | Application number, filing date | 90310556.7 | 27.09.1990 | [1991/14] | Priority number, date | JP19890251250 | 27.09.1989 Original published format: JP 25125089 | JP19900077258 | 26.03.1990 Original published format: JP 7725890 | [1991/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0420625 | Date: | 03.04.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0420625 | Date: | 18.03.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0420625 | Date: | 19.07.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.01.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B66C23/88, B66C23/90 | [1992/12] | CPC: |
B66C23/905 (EP,US);
B66C15/00 (KR);
B66C23/88 (KR)
|
Former IPC [1991/14] | B66C23/88 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1991/14] | Title | German: | Kran-Sicherheitssystem | [1991/14] | English: | Safety device for crane | [1991/14] | French: | Dispositif de sécurité pour une grue | [1991/14] | Examination procedure | 04.10.1990 | Examination requested [1991/14] | 31.03.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.06.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.10.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.01.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.04.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 04.04.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.04.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0154069 (MERRYWEATHER & SONS [GB]); | [A]EP0063709 (CAMIVA SA [FR]); | [A]GB2204014 (SCOTT JCB LIMITED) |