EP0420635 - Diagnostic reagents for leishmaniasis [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.06.1993 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.06.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.08.1993 [1993/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Miles, Michael Alexander 46 The Mall Southgate London N14 6LN / GB | For all designated states Howard, Michael Keith 13 Princes Road Penge London SE20 / GB | For all designated states Kelly, John Morrison 1 Rivington Crescent Mill Hill London NW7 2LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/14] | For all designated states Miles, Michael Alexander 46 The Mall Southgate, London N14 6LN / GB | ||
For all designated states Howard, Michael Keith 13 Princes Road Penge, London SE20 / GB | |||
For all designated states Kelly, John Morrison 1 Rivington Crescent Mill Hill, London NW7 2LE / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1991/14] | Representative(s) | Perry, Robert Edward, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/14] | Perry, Robert Edward, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 90310572.4 | 27.09.1990 | [1991/14] | Priority number, date | GB19890021937 | 28.09.1989 Original published format: GB 8921937 | [1991/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0420635 | Date: | 03.04.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0420635 | Date: | 27.05.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.04.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68, // C12N15/30 | [1991/14] | CPC: |
C07K14/44 (EP);
C12Q1/6893 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | ES, FR, GB, GR, IT [1991/14] | Title | German: | Diagnostische Reagenzien für Leishmaniasis | [1991/14] | English: | Diagnostic reagents for leishmaniasis | [1991/14] | French: | Réactifs de diagnostic de leishmaniasis | [1991/14] | File destroyed: | 22.08.2001 | Examination procedure | 28.11.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/31] | 11.03.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1993/31] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 11.01.1993 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1992 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO8401174 (HARVARD COLLEGE [US]); | [A]EP0135108 (UNIV ROCKEFELLER [US]) | [A] - BIOCHEMICAL SOCIETY TRANSACTIONS vol. 17, no. 1, January 1989LONDON UK. pages 168 - 169; MACFARLANE J. ET AL.: 'CHARACTERIZATION OF A LEISHMANIA DONOVANI ANTIGEN SIMILAR TO HEAT SHOCK PROTEIN 70.' | [A] - MOLECULAR AND BIOCHEMICAL PARISITOLOGY vol. 34, no. 3, 1989AMSTERDAM pages 261 - 268; ELLIS J. ET AL.: 'IDENTIFICATION OF OLCLONING OF A POLYMORPHIC DNA FRAGMENT FROM THE GENOME OF LEISHMANIA DONOVANI' |